Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Case #: 1:22-cv-11784
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2022
Terminated:Feb 23, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 17, 2023 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC
190 Toray Drive
Front Royal,, VA 22630
Represented By
Paula C. Cedillo
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Dean Elwell
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative
300 Baker Avenue, Suite 101
Concord, MA 01742
Represented By
Thomas A. Bockhorst
Reed And Giordano, P.A.
contact info
Philip M. Giordano
Reed & Giordano, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 03, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/03 1:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, with Certificate of Service by Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
20 20 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Thu 02/23 4:20 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (60 Days).(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/23 4:19 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re18 Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. " The clerk shall issue a 60 day order of dismissal." (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/10 7:23 AM
Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/13/2023 to Respond to Complaint by Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC.(Elwell, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/26 4:41 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re16 Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 02/10/2023.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/23 5:54 PM
Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/10/2023 to Respond to Complaint by Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC.(Elwell, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/28 4:17 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/27/23. (Molloy, Maryellen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/27 3:13 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/27/2023 to Respond to Complaint by Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC.(Elwell, Dean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/13 5:32 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re12 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. ANSWER DUE BY 12/28/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/09 3:50 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/28/2022 to Respond to Complaint by Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC.(Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/15 1:24 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. ANSWER DUE BY 12/14/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/11 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Elwell on behalf of Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC (Elwell, Dean)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/11 1:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/14/22 to Respond to Complaint by Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC.(Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/11 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paula C. Cedillo on behalf of Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC (Cedillo, Paula)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/11 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Finn on behalf of Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/24 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Bockhorst on behalf of Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative (Bockhorst, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/24 12:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative. Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC served on 10/21/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/19 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Wed 10/19 2:44 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Complaint,, Revised Civil Cover Sheet by Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 10/19 2:27 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/19 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against Nature's Touch Frozen Foods, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9549149 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Welch Foods, Inc., A Cooperative.(Giordano, Philip) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/19/2022) (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet
Att: 4 (10/19/2022) Exhibit A,
Att: 5 (10/19/2022) Exhibit B,
Att: 6 (10/19/2022) Exhibit C,
Att: 7 (10/19/2022) Exhibit D,
Att: 8 (10/19/2022) Exhibit E,
Att: 9 (10/19/2022) Exhibit F