South Carolina District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00801
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Oct 20, 2022 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Anthony Johnson (1)
Represented By
Mark Campbell McLawhorn
Federal Public Defender'S Office (cola)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elliott Bishop Daniels
Us Attorneys Office (cola)
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/20/2022 4:12 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
1 1 Order to Seal Indictment as to Joseph Anthony Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/20/2022. (lbak)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Joseph Anthony Johnson (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (lbak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
6 6 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT as to Joseph Anthony Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/20/2022. (lbak)
Related: [-]
8 8 STANDING ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Joseph Anthony Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/20/2022. (lbak)
Related: [-]