Delaware District Court
Judge:Matthew F Kennelly
Case #: 1:22-cv-01375
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2023 5:35 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
10X Genomics, Inc.
Represented By
Li Shen
contact info
Alexandra M. Ewing
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Jason James Rawnsley
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Kiley White
contact info
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Ronald J. Pabis
contact info
Stefani C. Smith
contact info
Paul T. Ehrlich
contact info
Samantha A. Jameson
contact info
Robert L. Gerrity
contact info
Matthew D. Powers
contact info
Counter Defendant
NanoString Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Edward R. Reines
contact info
Derek C. Walter
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Defendant
10X Genomics, Inc.
Represented By
Li Shen
contact info
Alexandra M. Ewing
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Jason James Rawnsley
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Kiley White
contact info
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Ronald J. Pabis
contact info
Stefani C. Smith
contact info
Paul T. Ehrlich
contact info
Samantha A. Jameson
contact info
Robert L. Gerrity
contact info
Matthew D. Powers
contact info
Plaintiff
NanoString Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Edward R. Reines
contact info
Derek C. Walter
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 2/1/2024. (apk)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
210 210 order Oral Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/06 9:45 AM
ORAL ORDER: The parties' stipulation209 to stay deadlines between now and 5/12/2025 is granted. This may not be used as a basis to extend any other filing deadlines in this case. A joint status report is to be filed by 12:00 noon Central Time on 5/13/2025. Ordered by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 5/6/2025. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
209 209 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 05/05 4:55 PM
[SEALED] STIPULATION Staying Certain Deadlines by 10X Genomics, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
208 208 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/30 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Withdraw of Robert L. Gerrity by 10X Genomics, Inc. (Rawnsley, Jason)
Related: [-]