Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Durkin
Referred: Jeffrey Cummings
Case #: 1:22-cv-05835
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2022
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2023 4:30 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Shenzhen Xiaoteng Technology Limited
Represented By
Jun Ye
Getech Law LLC
contact info
Ge Lei
Getech Law LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Danxiao Information Technology Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shenzhen Aigan Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shenzhen Love Sense Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Shenzhen Xiaoteng Technology Limited
Represented By
Jun Ye
Getech Law LLC
contact info
Ge Lei
Getech Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Danxiao Information Technology Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Aigan Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Love Sense Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Jason Liang Xu
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Pmj PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 8:55 PM CDT
Monday, October 24, 2022
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Lovense; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19974104.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 10 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 15 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 9 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lovense by Patrick M Jones (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs MOTION by Plaintiff Lovense for temporary restraining order(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 15 pgs MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Jones, Patrick) Modified on 10/24/2022 (ecw, ).
Related: [-]
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lovense (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Danxiao Information Technology Ltd., Shenzhen Aigan Technology Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Love Sense Technology Co. Ltd. by Patrick M Jones (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]