Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Case #: 1:22-mc-91530
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 10, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/10 4:17 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER of Continuance to November 8, 2023 and Excludable Delay as to Brian Andrew Bushell. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Thu 08/10 4:12 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to November 8, 2023. " ALLOWED. This is an old case. No more continuances will be authorized." (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Thu 08/10 11:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to November 8, 2023 Responses due by 8/24/2023 (Holcomb, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Continuance and Excludable Delay
Thursday, May 11, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/11 4:35 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER of Continuance to August 10, 2023 and Excludable Delay as to Brian Andrew Bushell.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Thu 05/11 4:31 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re11 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
11 11 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Wed 05/10 2:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to August 10, 2023 Responses due by 5/24/2023 (Holcomb, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Continuance and Excludable Delay
Thursday, February 16, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/17 6:47 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER of Continuance and Excludable Delay as to Brian Andrew Bushell.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/17 6:45 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re8 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict to May 12, 2023.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/17 6:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to May 12, 2023 by USA.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 09, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/16 6:03 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER of Continuance and Excludable Delay as to Brian Andrew Bushell.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/16 6:03 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 12/16 6:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 3/13/2023 by USA.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/25 4:20 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER of Continuance and Excludable Delay as to Brian Andrew Bushell.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Tue 10/25 4:18 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting1 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict to December 12, 2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 10/25 9:15 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
1 1 motion Motion for Extension of Time to Indict Tue 10/25 9:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to November 23, 2022. Responses due by 11/7/2022 (Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order