Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:22-cv-61983
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2022
Case in other court:17th Judicial Circuit Court, CACE-22-013253 (12)
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Charles Burrows
Hollywood Police Department Badge No. 3288, individually C/O Hollywood Police Department 3250 Hollywood Blvd.
Hollywood, FL 33021
Represented By
Tamatha Suzanne Alvarez
Martin, Lister & Alvarez
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Sands
Represented By
Court Edward Keeley
Court Keeley, P.A.
contact info
Douglas Fredric Eaton
Eaton & Wolk, P.L.
contact info
Todd Poses
Poses , Poses, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 14, 2022
16 16 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 11/14 11:11 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Deborah Sands(Keeley, Court)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A
Friday, November 04, 2022
15 15 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 11/04 2:18 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Charles Burrows. (Alvarez, Tamatha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 11/02 11:03 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
13 13 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/01 12:18 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Deborah Sands (Poses, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 10/28 10:42 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/27 6:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Court Edward Keeley on behalf of Deborah Sands (Keeley, Court)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/27 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Poses on behalf of Deborah Sands (Poses, Todd)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/27 5:36 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deborah Sands (Poses, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/26 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamatha Suzanne Alvarez on behalf of Charles Burrows (Alvarez, Tamatha)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/26 10:44 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Charles Burrows (Alvarez, Tamatha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/26 10:32 AM
NOTICE by Charles Burrows of Filing All Records and Proceedings Before the State Court (Alvarez, Tamatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - All Records and Proceedings Before State Court
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
7 7 4 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 10/26 11:22 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT: Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
Related: [-]
4 4 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. (eca)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. (eca)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 10/25 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Deborah Sands as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Leatherwood, deceased v. charles Burrows, individually) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16049734, filed by Charles Burrows.(Alvarez, Tamatha) Modified Attachment Description on 10/25/2022 (nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint & Other Documents, No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed.
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 10/25 4:35 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 10/25 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. (eca)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 10/25 4:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2022. (eca)
Related: [-]