California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:22-cv-07762
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 2:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Matthew D. Emrich
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
PO BOX 65015
Anaheim, CA 92815
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
David Radel
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
United States Attorney's Office 300 N. Los Angeles Street 7th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
Plaintiff
Aseel Al-Sufyani
Represented By
Salah O. Khatib
Abusharar And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 28, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 07/28 12:18 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On July 27, 2023, Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, dismissing the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)34 . Having considered the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the action without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
34 34 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 07/27 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
33 33 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 12/28 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OFAPPLICATION32 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and STAYS the action until August 22, 2023. The court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report on the earlier of August 15, 2023 or seven (7) days after USCIS issues a determination regarding Plaintiff'sApplication. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
32 32 stip Stay Case Wed 12/21 6:03 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Matthew D. Emrich, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Matthew D. Emrich(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Ted H. Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party David Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2022
31 31 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant Christopher A. Wray served on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant David Radel served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 4:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 3:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant Matthew D. Emrich served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 11/07 3:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
23 23 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/26 2:56 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
22 22 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:16 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (et)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:15 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (et)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:13 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant David Radel. (et)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:12 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (et)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:11 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ted H. Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:09 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou. (et)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:08 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Matthew D. Emrich. (et)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 12:07 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (et)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/25 11:55 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/25 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/25 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:21 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:21 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:20 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:19 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:18 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:17 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 10/25 11:17 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/25 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani, (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/25 11:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/25 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34210230 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Aseel Al-Sufyani. (Attorney Salah O. Khatib added to party Aseel Al-Sufyani (pty:pla))(Khatib, Salah)
Related: [-]