Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-21517
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JOSE ALONZO LOPEZ
Represented By
BUFFY K MARTINES
Laminack Pirtle & Martines - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 04, 2023
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Fri 05/05 12:09 PM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by May 18, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BUFFY K MARTINES on behalf of JOSE ALONZO LOPEZ (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/25 1:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/25 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7529847.), filed by JOSE ALONZO LOPEZ. (MARTINES, BUFFY)
Related: [-]