Original Case: 2:19-cv-20022

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02971
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2022
Terminated:Sep 25, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 26, 2023 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
REGO TRADING INC
Represented By
Andrew S. Esler
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Heather R. Boshak
Fox Rothschild
contact info
David J. Sprong
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
BASIC TRUCKING INC
Represented By
Andrew S. Esler
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Heather R. Boshak
Fox Rothschild
contact info
David J. Sprong
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
VLADIMIR SHUKHAM
Represented By
Andrew S. Esler
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Heather R. Boshak
Fox Rothschild
contact info
David J. Sprong
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
VLADIMIR SHUKHMAN
Represented By
Andrew S. Esler
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Heather R. Boshak
Fox Rothschild
contact info
David J. Sprong
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JENNIFER ZACHARCZUK
Represented By
Michele A. Moreno
Virginia & Ambinder
contact info
Andrew Glenn
Jafe Glenn Law Group
contact info
John M. Harras
Virginia & Ambinder
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/26/2023 4:26 AM EDT
Thursday, October 20, 2022
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Basic Trucking Inc, Rego Trading Inc and Vladimir Shukham in District Court No. 2-19-cv-20022. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 1 pgs DC Order 9/20/22
Att: 3 12 pgs DC Report
Att: 4 1 pgs caption
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter