Original Case: 1:19-cv-06732

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02916
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2022
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 26, 2023 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
LOYDA SANTIAGO
Represented By
Sarah B. Jansen
HeplerBroom, LLC
contact info
Robert E. Elworth
HEPLER BROOM, LLC
contact info
Stephanie Weiner
HEPLER BROOM, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
RICK TABISZ
Represented By
Sarah B. Jansen
HeplerBroom, LLC
contact info
Robert E. Elworth
HEPLER BROOM, LLC
contact info
Stephanie Weiner
HEPLER BROOM, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SARAH CHILCUTT
Represented By
Ian M. Barney
BARNEY & HOURIHANE, LLP
contact info
Bhavani Raveendran
ROMANUCCI & BLANDIN, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SARAH CHILCUTT, Individually and as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Aaron Chilcutt, deceased
Represented By
Sam Harton
ROMANUCCI & BLANDIN, LLC
contact info
Antonio M. Romanucci
ROMANUCCI & BLANDIN, LLC
contact info
Ian M. Barney
BARNEY & HOURIHANE, LLP
contact info
Bhavani Raveendran
ROMANUCCI & BLANDIN, LLC
contact info

GPO Jul 21 2023
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. We DISMISS this interlocutory appeal for lack of jurisdiction and allow the case to proceed in the normal course. Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge; Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge and John Z. Lee, Circuit Judge. [7325061-1] [7325061] [22-2916]

Docket last updated: 07/26/2023 3:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/08/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/05/2022 for Loyda Santiago and Rick Tabisz. [1] [7269168] 22-2916 (ER) [Entered: 10/26/2022 12:42 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 56 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court