New Jersey District Court
Judge:Stanley R Chesler
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:22-cv-06298
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Case in other court:Bergen County Superior Court, BER-L-68-00022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 25, 2023 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CO. 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-10
Defendant
TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By
THOMAS M. MADDEN
Morrison Mahoney LLP
contact info
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
SHANNON GOMEZ
Represented By
MARK MCBRATNEY
Seigel Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 05/15 9:38 AM
CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/15/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 05/14 2:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by TARGET CORPORATION. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 04/30 11:17 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/1/2024. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 4/30/2024. (tt, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/30 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2024. COUNSEL REPORTED CASE SETTLED. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
17 17 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/28 12:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Settlement Conference held on 3/28/2024. Counsel shall contact the Court within 5 weeks as to the status of the case (tt, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 03/25 8:51 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGE Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY WITH THE ADJUSTER AND CLIENTS TO APPEAR IN PERSON (tt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/05 11:35 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY WITH THE ADJUSTER AND CLIENTS TO APPEAR IN PERSON (tt, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/21 10:26 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY WITH CLIENTS AND THE ADJUSTER MUST APPEAR IN PERSON (tt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 02/20 11:29 AM
Letter from Thomas Madden. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/13 8:36 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY WITH THE ADJUSTER AND CLIENTS TO APPEAR IN PERSON (tt, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Mon 02/12 3:25 PM
Letter from Thomas Madden. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/29 3:37 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/8/2024 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/29/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 01/29 7:29 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY WITH THE ADJUSTER AND CLIENTS TO APPEAR IN PERSON. (tt, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/29 6:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 1/29/2024. (spc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Fri 01/26 12:21 PM
Letter from Thomas Madden. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/31 12:13 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 1/29/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/31/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Mon 10/30 2:44 PM
Letter. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/25 11:33 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/31/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/25/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 07/25 11:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2023. Order to be filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Fri 07/21 12:30 PM
Letter. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
misc QC - Generic Message Tue 06/27 6:51 AM
CHAMBER'S NOTATION: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED BEFORE JUDGE CHESLER FOR 6/27/2023 HAS BEEN ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Mon 06/26 12:17 PM
Letter from Thomas M. Madden. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Mon 06/26 10:05 AM
Letter from Mark McBratney, Esq.. (MCBRATNEY, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 06/23 9:50 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: **TIME CHANGE** Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST APPEAR CLIENTS/ADJUSTERS MUST BE AVAILABLE BY PHONE. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 06/22 7:47 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. TRIAL COUNSEL WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY SHALL APPEAR, CLIENTS/ADJUSTERS MUST BE AVAILABLE BY PHONE. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/21 10:55 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2023. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/21/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 03/21 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2023. Initial scheduling order (spc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
5 5 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 02/27 12:30 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by TARGET CORPORATION.(MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 02/10 11:12 AM
ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 3/20/2023 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/10/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/31 3:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TARGET CORPORATION.(MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 10/31 2:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
1 1 18 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/27 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORPORATION from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-4968-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13787900), filed by TARGET CORPORATION.(MADDEN, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/27 3:15 PM
Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Thu 10/27 3:16 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
Related: [-]