Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Louis H Kornreich
Case #: 1:14-bk-10756
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2014
Dismissed:Dec 22, 2014
Terminated:Jan 07, 2015

Debtor
GNP Maine Holdings, LLC
50 Main St
East Millinocket, ME 04430-1158
Represented By
GNP Maine Holdings, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 26, 2014 9:47 PM EST
Creditor
Portage Wood Products, LLC
Represented By
Michael F. Hahn, Esq.
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Creditor
Maine Environmental LLC
P.O. Box 480
Millinocket, ME 04462
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Maine Woods Company LLC
Represented By
Michael F. Hahn, Esq.
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Creditor
Town of Millinocket
100 Middle Street
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
D. Sam Anderson, Esq.
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson
contact info
Creditor
Millinocket Fabrication & Machine, Inc.
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Northern Construction Services, Inc.
Rudman Winchell P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Orion Timberlands LLC
Represented By
Michael F. Hahn, Esq.
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Creditor
PTI Warehousing, Inc.
Rudman Winchell P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Penobscot Cleaning Services, Inc.
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
MMCCB, LLC
Rudman Winchell P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Pottle's Transportation, LLC
Rudman Winchell P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Prentiss & Carlisle Management Company
P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Prentiss & Carlisle Management Company, Inc.
P.O. Box 1401 P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Creditor
R.F. Chamberland, Inc.
P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Seven Islands Land Company
Represented By
Michael F. Hahn, Esq.
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Creditor
Timberland Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Treeline, Inc.
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Herbert C. Haynes, Inc.
P.O. Box 96
Winn, ME 04495
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Great northwoods, LLC
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Great Northwoods, LLC
P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Gerald Pelletier, Inc.
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Evergreen Trading Company, LLC
Rudman Winchell P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Elm Tree Holdings, LLC
P.O. Box 1401
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Allison A. Economy, Esq.
Rudman Winchell
contact info
Curtis E. Kimball, Esq.
Rudman & Winchell
contact info
Creditor
Town of East Millinocket
100 Middle Street
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
D. Sam Anderson, Esq.
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson
contact info
Creditor
D & S Engineering, Inc.
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Creditor
Chapman Trucking Inc.
P.O. Box 480
Millinocket, ME 04462
Represented By
Dean A. Beaupain, Esq.
Law Offices Of Dean A. Beaupain
contact info
Interested Party
GNP EAST, INC.
Molleur Law Office 4
Biddeford, ME 04005
Represented By
Tanya Sambatakos, Esq.
Molleur Law Office
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Lynco, Inc.
78 Rice Street
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Jeremy R. Fischer
Drummond Woodsum
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Lynch Logistics, Inc.
78 Rice Street
Bangor, ME 04401
Represented By
Jeremy R. Fischer
Drummond Woodsum
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.
PO Box 1385 262 Bomarc Rd
Bangor, ME 04402
Represented By
Jeremy R. Fischer
Drummond Woodsum
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Jennifer H. Pincus, Esq.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 11/10/2015 1:46 PM EST
Tuesday, September 23, 2014
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-10756 [misc,invol7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 3554950. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition. Fee Amount $ 335. Re: GNP Maine Holdings, LLC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc. (attorney Jeremy R. Fischer), Lynch Logistics, Inc. (attorney Jeremy R. Fischer), Lynco, Inc. (attorney Jeremy R. Fischer). (Fischer, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Fischer, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Lynch Logistics, Inc.. (Fischer, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
4 4 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Lynco, Inc.. (Fischer, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1014 Filed by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc., Lynch Logistics, Inc., Lynco, Inc.. (Fischer, Jeremy)
Related: [-]