New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:22-mj-00712
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 28, 2022 3:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Louis Carusone (1)
Represented By
John F. Speranza
contact info
Anthony A. Dentino
Dentino, Cammarata & Byrnes
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle P. Rossi
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Rochester
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/22/2023 7:29 PM EST
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Louis Carusone (1). (JB)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Louis Carusone. (JB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Louis Carusone (1). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 10/26/2022.(JB)
Related: [-]