California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:22-cv-07892
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2022
Terminated:Dec 15, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2023 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Morsco Supply, LLC
Represented By
Alyssa S. Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Rachael Sarah Lavi
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alyssa S Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Keith A Jacoby
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Alyssa S. Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Rachael Sarah Lavi
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alyssa S Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Keith A Jacoby
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC
Represented By
Alyssa S. Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Rachael Sarah Lavi
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Alyssa S Gjedsted
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Keith A Jacoby
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rene Hernandez
Represented By
Henry Aaron Elyashar
Elyashar Law Firm Apc
contact info
Diego F Aviles
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
David D Bibiyan
Bibiyan Law Group Apc
contact info
Robert Barkev Payaslyan
Bibiyan Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
21 21 misc Receipt Wed 12/28 3:49 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22STCV30190, acknowledged on 12/28/2022. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
20 20 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 12/15 8:56 PM
CORRECTED TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. (gk)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 12/15 9:13 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Spring Street Courthouse. (gk)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Remand Case to State Court Thu 12/15 9:01 AM
REMAND ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation17 , the case is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number 22STCV30190, and the case is closed. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
17 17 stip Remand Case to State Court Wed 12/14 7:07 PM
First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiff Rene Hernandez.( Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 02, 2022
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 12/05 2:33 PM
MINUTES OF Mandatory Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court hears from the parties on the joint status report. The parties are discussing a stipulated dismissal of Defendant Morsco Supply, LLC and a stipulated remand. The Court continues the Mandatory Scheduling Conference to 12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. If the parties file a joint request to dismiss Defendant Morsco Supply, LLC and to remand this case by 9:00 AM on 12/15/2022, the continued Mandatory Scheduling Conference will be vacated without further court order. If the parties are unable to stipulate to remand this case, Plaintiff is directed to file a motion to remand no later than 12/16/2022 (and the parties must appear on that date as stated above). Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
15 15 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 11/28 10:14 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties have stated in their joint Rule 26(f) report that they consent to conduct all further proceedings in this case before a magistrate judge. Dkt. No.14 . If so, they shall file a fully executed statement of consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by no later than 9:00 a.m. on December 1, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 11/22 11:39 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-15, filed by Plaintiff Rene Hernandez.. ( Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/04 5:20 PM
Notice of Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Stanley Blumfeld, Jr. filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc., Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC. (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 11/02 6:46 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 2, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by November 22, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 11/02 6:44 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 11/02 4:58 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-07892 SB(PLAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 11/01 9:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc., Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 served on October 31, 2022. (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 10/31 11:20 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/31 11:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/31 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Fri 10/28 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc.. (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/28 5:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc. (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/28 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc., (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/28 5:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc.. (Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/28 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV30190 Receipt No: ACACDC-34239344 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC, Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Alyssa S Gjedsted added to party Morsco Supply, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa S Gjedsted added to party Todd Pipe & Supply, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa S Gjedsted added to party Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gjedsted, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Rachel Lavi,
Att: 2 20 pgs Exhibit A to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi,
Att: 14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Rachael Lavi
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 10/31 11:31 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc., Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Rene Hernandez. Filed in State Court on 9/15/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/31 11:36 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Rene Hernandez, upon Defendant Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc. served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leigh Johnson, Authorized to Accept Service of Process for Capitol Corporate Service, Inc. - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 10/14/2022 Submitted with Attachment 6 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/31 11:42 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Rene Hernandez, upon Defendant Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leigh Johnson, Authorized to Accept Service of Process for Capitol Corporate Service, Inc. - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 10/12/2022 Submitted with Attachment 7 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/31 11:46 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Rene Hernandez, upon Defendant Morsco Supply, LLC served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leigh Johnson, Authorized to Accept Service of Process for Capitol Corporate Service, Inc. - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 10/14/2022 Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 10/31 11:55 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Morsco Supply, LLC, Todd Pipe Holdings, Inc., Todd Pipe and Supply, LLC. Filed in State Court on 10/26/2022 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]