New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Margaret M Cangilos-Ruiz
Case #: 5:06-bk-34115
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2006
Discharged:Oct 17, 2012
Terminated:Nov 01, 2012
Plan Confirmed:Dec 28, 2007
Creditor
GE Card Services
Creditor
HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Creditor
HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA)
Creditor
Nuvell Credit Corporation, by and through its Servicer, Nuvell Financial Services Corp.
Creditor
SEFCU
Creditor
Sharinn & Lipshie, P.C.
Debtor
Octavia Cannon
Trustee
Mark W. Swimelar
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee

GPO Jun 20 2007
Memorandum Decision, Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order; Ordered that Creditor Nuvell Credit Corp.'s objection to Chapter 13 plan is granted; Ordered that the Chapter 13 Plan is returned to this Court's Confirmation Calendar to be held on 7/31/07 at 2:00 p.m. in Utica; Signed on 6/20/2007. (Davis, Darcy)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.