Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-21989
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-02553
Last checked: Saturday Apr 29, 2023 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE REED
Represented By
NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD
The Gori Law Firm - Edwardsville Il
contact info
EVAN D BUXNER
Gori Julian & Associates - Edwardsville Il
contact info
SAMIRA KHAZAELI
Gori Law Firm Pc - Edwardsville Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, November 04, 2022
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/04 3:47 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by LAWRENCE REED. (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/04 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN D BUXNER on behalf of LAWRENCE REED (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/04 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD on behalf of LAWRENCE REED (MAYFIELD, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/04 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMIRA KHAZAELI on behalf of LAWRENCE REED (KHAZAELI, SAMIRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
11 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17, Emailed to Counsel for Plaintiff, Jason B. Epps, The Gori Law Firm at Jason@gorilaw.com. (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/31 3:21 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 11/21/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 10/31 2:55 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Emailed to Counsel for Plaintiff, Jason B. Epps, The Gori Law Firm at Jason@gorilaw.com. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 10/31 1:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-02553. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/31 3:46 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17, Emailed to Counsel for Plaintiff, Jason B. Epps, The Gori Law Firm at Jason@gorilaw.com. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
7 7 order Order Fri 10/28 3:28 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-178) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Jason B. Epps as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. cc: Jason B. Epps. (CLK) Modified text on 10/14/2022 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2553 JRT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-] lated Cases, Non-MDL
Thursday, October 13, 2022
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9821363) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/31/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet