Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:22-cv-62028
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 04, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Case in other court:17th Judicial Circuit Court, CASE 22-011309
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2023 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC
Represented By
Christine Fuqua Gay
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Matthew David Grosack
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Alec Michael Puig
Holland And Knight
contact info
Defendant
Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC
3601 S.W. 160th Avenue Suite 250
Miramar, FL 33027
Represented By
Christine Fuqua Gay
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Matthew David Grosack
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Alec Michael Puig
Holland And Knight
contact info
Mediator
Glenn Waldman
Waldman Trigoboff Hilderbrandt et al 500 East Broward Boulevard Broward Financial Center, Suite 1700
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394
Plaintiff
Fernando Catania
Represented By
Patrick Brooks LaRou
Peregonza The Attorneys, PLLC
contact info
Jason Saul Remer
Remer, Georges-Pierre & Hoogerwoerd, PLLC
contact info
Michael Thomas Wojnar
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ameet Vohra
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Represented By
Christine Fuqua Gay
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Matthew David Grosack
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Alec Michael Puig
Holland And Knight
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 11, 2023
42 42 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 12/11 12:02 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
41 41 misc Stipulation Thu 12/07 10:39 AM
STIPULATION STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC (Grosack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 11/16 12:36 PM
ORDER Closing Case. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal by December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Wed 11/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC (Gay, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
38 38 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/02 5:43 PM
Renewed MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2023 (Puig, Alec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
37 37 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 2:51 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 4/2/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Discovery due by 12/1/2023., Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2023., In Limine Motions due by 2/22/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2023., Motions due by 12/22/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/14/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all pretrial non-dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
36 36 minutes Status Conference Mon 10/02 5:49 PM
PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on October 2, 2023. Total time in court: 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jason Saul Remer, Alec Michael Puig. Paper order to follow. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-301-3276 / mjsfcs@aol.com. (bto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 01/25 12:16 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION: Mediation Hearing set for 4/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Glenn Waldman, Esq. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (mab)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
19 19 adr Consent to Mediation Mon 01/23 5:09 PM
Consent to Mediation byVOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC(Grosack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/03 12:07 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Calendar Call set for 10/10/2023 1:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2023. Discovery due by 6/20/2023. Expert Discovery due by 6/20/2023. Fact Discovery due by 6/20/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2023. Mediation Deadline 7/4/2023. In Limine Motions due by 9/11/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2023. Motions due by 7/12/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/2/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 7/4/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (mab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/15 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Brooks LaRou on behalf of Fernando Catania. Attorney Patrick Brooks LaRou added to party Fernando Catania(pty:pla). (LaRou, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Wed 12/07 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jason Saul Remer Related [+]
Related: [-] mer, Jason
notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Wed 12/07 3:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information for attorney Jason Saul Remer. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/01 4:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Fernando Catania. Replies due by 12/8/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-] mer, Jason
Sunday, November 20, 2022
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sun 11/20 11:16 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot7 the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in light of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [ECF No. 8]. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/20/2022. (mg01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/17 7:33 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC (Puig, Alec)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/17 3:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC. Responses due by 12/1/2022 (Gay, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 11/15 6:20 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC(Gay, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 misc Status Report Tue 11/15 6:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC (Gay, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 11/07 9:33 AM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians of FL, LLC., filed by Fernando Catania. Related [+] Modified Text on 11/7/2022 (cds)
Related: [-] mer, Jason
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/02 3:06 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2022 (Gay, Christine)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/02 2:31 PM
ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for a settlement conference, ( Statement of Claim due by 11/22/2022.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/02 2:27 PM
ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, Related [+] Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/17/2023 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-] moval Status Report due by 11/17/2022.
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 11/02 2:25 PM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 11/01 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. §1446 by VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Ameet Vohra, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC (Grosack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 11/01 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16067935, filed by Ameet Vohra, VOHRA WOUND PHYSICIANS OF FL, LLC, Vohra Wound Physicians Management, LLC. (No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed)(Grosack, Matthew) Modified Attachments on 11/1/2022 (aao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Other State Court Filings,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 11/01 12:41 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
Related: [-]