Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:22-cv-02790
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2022
Terminated:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2023 3:46 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Ansys, Inc.
Represented By
Heath Novosad
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
Jared Medrano
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Mary Crawford
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
John Francis Luman, III
Daniels & Tredennick PLLC
contact info
Lori A Johnson
Parker Daniels Kibort LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Design Ready Controls, Inc.
Represented By
Lynn E. Rzonca
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Benjamin Nichols Simler
contact info
Mary Andreleita Walker
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ansys, Inc.
Represented By
Heath Novosad
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
Jared Medrano
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Mary Crawford
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
John Francis Luman, III
Daniels & Tredennick PLLC
contact info
Lori A Johnson
Parker Daniels Kibort LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Design Ready Controls, Inc.
Represented By
Lynn E. Rzonca
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Benjamin Nichols Simler
contact info
Mary Andreleita Walker
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Dulana Rupanetti
Represented By
Anne E. Rondoni Tavernier
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Barbara Marchevsky
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Ansys, Inc.
Represented By
Heath Novosad
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
Jared Medrano
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Mary Crawford
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
contact info
John Francis Luman, III
Daniels & Tredennick PLLC
contact info
Lori A Johnson
Parker Daniels Kibort LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 12, 2023
42 42 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 06/12 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara Marchevsky (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
41 41 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Wed 05/10 8:16 PM
JUDGMENT(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/10 8:44 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 5/10/2023.(MSK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/03 12:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Action by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Ansys, Inc. and Dulana Rupanetti. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Tue 04/04 7:23 AM
ORDER - 1. The parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Pending Formal Settlement Agreement [Docket No.36 ] is APPROVED; 2. All dates and deadlines in this matter are STAYED; and 3. The parties shall file dismissal documents within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/3/2023.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
37 37 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 03/29 9:01 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re36 Stipulation. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation Wed 03/29 9:00 AM
STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Stay Pending Formal Settlement Agreement by Dulana Rupanetti. Jointly Signed by Design Ready Controls, Inc. and Ansys, Inc.. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/23 8:42 AM
ORDER on33 Stipulation. Design Ready Controls, Inc. answer due 3/29/2023; Dulana Rupanetti answer due 3/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/23/2023.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
34 34 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 02/22 4:13 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re33 Stipulation. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation Wed 02/22 4:10 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint by Dulana Rupanetti. Jointly Signed by Design Ready Controls, Inc. and Ansys, Inc.. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 02/07 1:21 PM
ORDER on30 Stipulation. Design Ready Controls, Inc. answer due 2/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/7/2023.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
31 31 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 02/06 1:58 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re30 Stipulation. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation Mon 02/06 1:56 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaims by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Ansys, Inc. and Dulana Rupanetti. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/23 11:54 AM
ORDER on27 Stipulation. Dulana Rupanetti answer due 2/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/19/2023.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
28 28 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 01/20 11:41 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re27 Stipulation. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation Fri 01/20 11:38 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant to Respond to Third-Party Complaint by Dulana Rupanetti. Jointly Signed by Design Ready Controls, Inc. and Ansys, Inc.. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/19 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Marchevsky on behalf of Dulana Rupanetti. (Marchevsky, Barbara)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/19 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Rondoni Tavernier on behalf of Dulana Rupanetti. (Rondoni Tavernier, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/17 10:47 AM
ORDER on22 Stipulation. Ansys, Inc. answer due 2/7/2023; Design Ready Controls, Inc. answer due 2/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/17/2023.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
23 23 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 01/13 8:05 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re22 Stipulation. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation Fri 01/13 8:02 PM
STIPULATION re11 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Ansys, Inc.. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/10 4:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ansys, Inc.. Dulana Rupanetti served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Luman, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
notice Notice to Attorney - JWB Case Reassigned Mon 01/09 11:37 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Jerry W. Blackwell, this case is reassigned to him. Judge Judge Eric C. Tostrud is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 22-cv-2790 JWB/LIB . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. . Note: any current hearings or conferences before the newly assigned district judge in this case are canceled unless otherwise indicated by the new DJ courtroom deputy. (kt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
19 19 service Summons Issued Thu 12/29 8:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Dulana Rupanetti. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
service Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons Wed 12/28 10:29 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Third-Party Defendant Dulana Rupanetti. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/28 2:24 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heath Novosad for Ansys, Inc. ; granting14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jared Medrano for Ansys, Inc. ; granting15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Francis Luman, III for Ansys, Inc. ; granting16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary Crawford for Ansys, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/28/2022. (KMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 12/27 5:12 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Rodman Crawford. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9971150 filed by Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 12/27 5:10 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Luman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9971136 filed by Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 12/27 5:06 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared A. Medrano. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9971123 filed by Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 12/27 5:02 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heath A. Novosad. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9971105 filed by Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 12/27 4:55 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Tue 12/27 4:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Dulana Rupanetti., COUNTERCLAIM against Design Ready Controls, Inc.. filed by Ansys, Inc.. (Johnson, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Friday, December 09, 2022
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/09 1:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. Ansys, Inc. served on 12/6/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Simler, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/04 11:52 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler for Design Ready Controls, Inc.; granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lynn E. Rzonca for Design Ready Controls, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/4/2022. (KMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Wed 11/02 11:56 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lynn E. Rzonca. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9868140 filed by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. (Walker, Mary)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Wed 11/02 11:53 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin N. Simler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9868126 filed by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. (Walker, Mary)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (AO 121) Wed 11/02 11:49 AM
REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Walker, Mary) cc: cc: U.S. Copyright Office. Modified text on 11/2/2022 (MMP)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 11/02 11:45 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Design Ready Controls, Inc.. (Walker, Mary)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/02 8:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Ansys, Inc. (MKB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 11/02 8:23 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd/4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 22-cv-2790 (ECT/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Wed 11/02 8:26 AM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Lynn E. Rzonca, Benjamin N. Simler as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/01 6:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Ansys, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9866866) filed by Design Ready Controls, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Walker, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet