California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00279
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Nov 03, 2022 12:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Sohail Mamdani (1)
Represented By
Kevin P. Rooney
Hammerschmidt Law Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael G. Tierney
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info
Alexandre Mikhail Dempsey
United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Oct 28 2022
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE AS TO SOHAIL MAMDANI,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Oct 31 2022
APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE BOND AND ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Nov 15 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Continuance of Status Conference, as to Sohail Mamdani (1), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2022. It is so found and ordered. At the request of the parties, the December 7, 2022, status hearing in the above case is CONTINUED until January 18, 2023, at 1:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. For the purpose of computing time under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq., within which trial must commence, the time period of December 7, 2022, through January 18, 2023, inclusive, is deemed excludable pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161 (h)(1)G), 3161(h)(7)(A), and 3161(h)(7)(B)(i) and (iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Nov 16 2022
STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on November 15, 2022. 5 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER currently set for 11/18/2022 has been CONTINUED to 12/2/2022 at 09:00 AM via zoom before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
GPO Dec 06 2022
PROTECTIVE ORDER Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P 16(D), signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2022 as to Sohail Mamdani. (Marrujo, C)
GPO Jan 10 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/2023. The Status Conference currently set for 1/18/2023 is CONTINUED to 4/5/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Mar 22 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani REGARDING MODIFICATIONOF PRETRIAL RELEASE CONDITIONS. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/2023. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Mar 29 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/29/2023. The Status Conference currently set for 4/5/2023 is CONTINUED to 5/31/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO May 25 2023
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/2023 as to Sohail Mamdani. (Vue, Yee)
GPO Sep 14 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/13/2023. The Status Conference set for 9/20/2023 is CONTINUED to 12/6/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. A Jury Trial is set for 6/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Nov 30 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Sohail Mamdani signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/29/2023. The Status Conference set for 12/6/2023 is CONTINUED to 2/7/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Jan 22 2024
ORDER of RECUSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/22/2024 as to Sohail Mamdani. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 1:22-cr-000279-JLT-BAM. (Maldonado, C)
GPO Apr 22 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Advance Status Conference as to Sohail Mamdani (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/22/2024. It is so ordered that that the status conference is advanced from May 8, 2024, to April 24, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The jury trial set for June 25, 2024 is vacated. Time was previously excluded through June 25, 2024. (Valdez, E)
GPO Nov 08 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Sohail Mamdani (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from November 13, 2024, to January 8, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). On that date, the parties shall be prepared to discuss when they will be able to set a trial date or a change of plea date. (Valdez, E)
GPO Jan 03 2025
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE AND SET TRIAL DATE as to Sohail Mamdani signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2025. IT IS SO ORDERED that the status conference set for January 8, 2025, is vacated. A jury trial is set for September 23, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4 before District Court Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Estimate time of trial is 7-8 days. A trial confirmation is set for September 8, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4 before District Court Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Time is excluded through trial pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Deputy Clerk CLA)

Docket last updated: 11/03/2022 1:17 AM PDT
Thursday, October 20, 2022
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Sohail Mamdani (1) count(s) 1-5, 6, 7, 8.. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 True Bill