Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-00323

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:22-ap-00221
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2022
Terminated:Mar 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Peyson Transport, LLC
18561 Misty Lake Dr.
Jupiter, FL 33458
Represented By
Peyson Transport, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole M Cameron
Nicole M. Cameron, P.A. 235 Apollo Beach Boulevard, #231
Apollo Beach, FL 33572
Represented By
Allan C Watkins
Watkins Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, July 13, 2023
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Thu 07/13 5:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AM. Receipt Number 165192. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/24 8:38 AM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-221 Closed. (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal (voluntary) (AP) Mon 03/06 11:36 AM
Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Allan C Watkins on behalf of Plaintiff Nicole M Cameron Related [+]. (Watkins, Allan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 02/03 4:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-00323-CPM, Doc. No. 24 . (Brenton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 12/30 11:50 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-00323-CPM, Doc. No. 22 . (Laura G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
7 7 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 12/21 12:40 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/6/2023 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Friday, December 16, 2022
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 12/16 10:23 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. and Certificate of Interested Persons Filed by Matthew G Davis on behalf of Defendant Peyson Transport, LLC Related [+]. (Davis, Matthew)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, December 15, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 12/16 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 12/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
4 4 court Notice of Deficient Filing (AP) Tue 12/13 12:27 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. No statement of corporate ownership statement filed on behalf of the corporation Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 12/30/2022. (Rutha)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, December 01, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/01 1:16 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Matthew G Davis on behalf of Defendant Peyson Transport, LLC. (Davis, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
court COURT - Notice Of Reassignment of Case (batch) Tue 11/08 3:14 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case to The Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen. (Bill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Thu 11/03 11:00 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 12/05/2022. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Wed 11/02 11:24 AM
Complaint by Nicole M Cameron against Peyson Transport, LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Watkins, Allan)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference