Maryland District Court
Judge:Brendan Abell Hurson
Case #: 8:22-cv-02834
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 04, 2023 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Bezhan Aziz
Represented By
Michael Gert Campbell
Miller Miller And Canby
contact info
Plaintiff
Ali Behroz Aziz
Represented By
William Stuart Heyman
Heyman Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Shinkay Aziz
Represented By
William Stuart Heyman
Heyman Law Firm
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 10/21/2024. (c/em 10/22/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/20/2024 (bw5s).

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
72 72 appeal USCA Order Tue 12/17 10:51 AM
ORDER of USCA Granting appellants leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shinkay Aziz and Ali Behroz Aziz. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
appeal Record to 4cca Tue 12/10 4:49 PM
Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]