California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 2:22-cv-08008
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 17, 2023
23 23 order Awarding EAJA Fees Thu 08/17 3:12 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees20 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
22 22 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 08/16 10:31 AM
Fee Agreement with EAJA Assignment filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,21 , Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees20 (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 08/15 2:04 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees20 . Plaintiff's counsel shall file evidence of Plaintiff's assignment of her EAJA award to her attorney no later than August 21, 2023. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
20 20 stip Award of EAJA Fees Mon 08/14 3:31 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $7,600.00. and Costs in the amount of $402.00 filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez.(Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
19 19 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 06/07 10:02 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, Related to: Order18 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is REVERSED, and this action is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
Related: [-]
18 18 23 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion on Social Security Cases Wed 06/07 9:48 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Re JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner15 . IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner and REMANDING this action for further proceedings consistent with this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
17 17 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Mon 06/05 8:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV22-8008 KK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2023
16 16 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Sun 06/04 6:09 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
15 15 motion Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases Wed 05/10 3:16 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
14 14 cs_rasgn Transferring Case purs GO 05-07 (Magistrate Judge)(G-13) Tue 04/25 3:43 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to General Order 05-07. ORDER case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for any matters referred pursuant to General Order 05-07. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08008 GW(KK). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/20 2:28 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Jennifer Tarn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/20 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary C Tsai counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Mary Tsai as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Mary C Tsai added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
11 11 respoth Administrative Record (Social Security) Mon 02/06 9:54 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (SOCIAL SECURITY) OF TERESA ORTIZ DE LOPEZ (mj) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/06 9:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Mon 12/12 3:13 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
8 8 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Tue 11/08 3:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Deborah L. Stachel, Regional Chief Counsel, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel-Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11/03 1:13 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 11/03 1:06 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 11/03 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/02 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez, identifying Joseph Graham. (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/02 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez. (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 11/02 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez. (Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/02 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34261270 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Teresa Ortiz De Lopez. (Attorney Andrew Thomas Koenig added to party Teresa Ortiz De Lopez(pty:pla))(Koenig, Andrew)
Related: [-]