California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:22-cv-01980
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2022
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2023 3:19 AM PDT
Amicus
ACLU Foundation of Southern California
ACLU Foundation of Southern California 1313 West 8th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Aclu Of Northern California
contact info
Amicus
ACLU Foundation of Northern California
ACLU Foundation of Northern California 39 Drumm Street
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Aclu Of Northern California
contact info
Amicus
A Voice for Choice Advocacy, Inc.
Represented By
Brad A. Hakala
The Hakala Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Laurie Rose Lubiano
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Megan R. O'Carroll
Department Of Justice
contact info
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Eserick Watkins
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Veling Tsai
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Richard E. Thorp
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
David E. Ryu
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Asif Mahmood
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Kristina Lawson
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Nicole A. Jeong
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
James M. Healzer
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Randy Hawkins
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Brooks
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Anne Bholat
Represented By
Aaron Lent
contact info
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Kheriaty
Represented By
Jenin Younes, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Gregory Dolin, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Laura B. Powell
contact info
Plaintiff
Pete Mazolewski
Represented By
Jenin Younes, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Gregory Dolin, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Laura B. Powell
contact info
Plaintiff
Azadeh Khatibi
Represented By
Jenin Younes, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Gregory Dolin, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Laura B. Powell
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Hoeg
Represented By
Jenin Younes, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Gregory Dolin, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Laura B. Powell
contact info
Plaintiff
Ram Duriseti
Represented By
Jenin Younes, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Gregory Dolin, PHV
New Civil Liberties Alliance
contact info
Laura B. Powell
contact info

GPO Nov 04 2022
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/4/22 GRANTING 10 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Gregory Dolin, PHV for Plaintiffs. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Nov 07 2022
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/04/2022 GRANTING 2 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Jenin Younes, PHV for Ram Duriseti, Tracy Hoeg, Azadeh Khatibi, Aaron Kheriaty, and Pete Mazolewski. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is DIRECTED to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
GPO Nov 29 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/29/22 ORDERING that Defendants' responses to the complaint will be due 30 days after the Court issues its ruling on the pending 5 motion for a preliminary injunction. The hearing on plaintiffs' pending motion will be rescheduled to 1/9/23 at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Defendants' opposition to the motion for a preliminary injunction shall be due 12/12/22. Any reply brief supporting the motion shall be due 12/27/22. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Dec 08 2022
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/7/2022 RELATING cases Hoeg et al v. Newsom et al 2:22-cv-1980 WBS AC and Hoang et al v. Bonta et al 2:22-cv-2147 DAD AC. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Jan 04 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/03/2023 GRANTING the 28 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. A Voice for Choice Advocacy, Inc. is DIRECTED to file the Brief forthwith. (Spichka, K.)
GPO Jan 11 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2023 GRANTING 31 American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California and American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California's Motion Leave to file amicus curiae brief. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Jan 25 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/2023 GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 5. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Feb 16 2023
27/2023. (Perdue, C.)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/16/2023 CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference to 4/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 3/
GPO Feb 27 2023
ald, et al. v. Lawson, et al., Appeal No. 22 56200, and Couris, et al. v. Lawson, et al., Appeal No. 23-55069.(Licea Chavez, V)ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/27/23 DIRICTING Defendants' response to the Complaint will be due 30 days after the date the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit issues its mandate in the consolidated appeals of McDon
GPO Apr 11 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/2023 ORDERING the parties shall submit to the court Joint Status Reports for purposes of scheduling no later than 14 days from the date of this Order, with proposed dates and deadlines, including trial, taking the restrictions of this Order into account. (Reader, L)
GPO Nov 01 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/1/2023: On the court's own motion, a hearing addressing whether these related actions are moot following the California Legislature's repeal of Business & Professions Code § 2270 is hereby SET for 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties in Hoeg shall file separate briefs addressing the mootness question on or before 11/27/2023. The Hoang plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint and to modify the scheduling order (Hoang Docket No. 39), currently set for 11/13/2023, is hereby RESET to 12/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Hoang parties are not required to submit any additional briefing in advance of the 12/18/2023 hearing, as they have already addressed the mootness issue in their briefs on the pending motion. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Nov 22 2023
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/21/2023 GRANTING 50 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Katherine Norman, PHV for Ram Duriseti, Tracy Hoeg, Azadeh Khatibi, Aaron Kheriaty, and Pete Mazolewski. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
GPO Dec 07 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2023 GRANTING 55 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney John J. Vecchione, PHV for Ram Duriseti, Tracy Hoeg, Azadeh Khatibi, Aaron Kheriaty, and Pete Mazolewski. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Dec 21 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/21/2023 re: The Court GRANTS the Hoang plaintiffs' and defendants' requests to modify the pretrial briefing schedule as follows: By 12/29/2023, the parties in both actions shall submit joint status reports proposing an updated dispositive motion briefing and hearing schedule. If the parties wish to propose updated discovery and/or trial dates, they may, but are not required to do so. The Hoeg plaintiffs may, if they choose, withdraw their pending Motion for Summary Judgment (Hoeg Docket No. 48), currently set for 1/8/2024, and file a new motion in compliance with the updated scheduling order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Jan 03 2024
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/02/24 MODIFYING the motion briefing schedule as follows: Defendants' motions to dismiss due: 01/29/24 and noticed for hearing for 04/01/24 at 1:30 p.m.; Plaintiffs' oppositions due: 02/29/24 and Defendants' replies due: 03/15/24. The court will not consider any motions for summary judgment prior to disposing of defendants' motions to dismiss. Should the motions to dismiss be denied, within 14 days of the court's order denying the motions, the parties shall submit a joint status report concerning a briefing schedule for summary judgment motions; and VACATING the 01/08/24 hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jan 03 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/03/24 RELATING cases 2:22-cv-1980 WBS AC, 2:22-cv-2147 WBS AC and 2:24-cv-0001 WBS AC. (Benson, A.)
GPO Apr 02 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 04/02/24 GRANTING 63 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING AS MOOT 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/26/2024 DIRECTING the plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees be filed with 60 days of the Supreme Court's decision in Lackey v. Stinnie, No. 23-621, defendants Opposition be filed within 30 days of the plaintiff's Motion, and any Reply Brief supporting the Motion due 15 days after submission of the defendants brief. (Woodson, A)

Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Monday, April 29, 2024
71 71 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/29 9:36 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/26/2024 DIRECTING the plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees be filed with 60 days of the Supreme Court's decision in Lackey v. Stinnie, No. 23-621, defendants Opposition be filed within 30 days of the plaintiff's Motion, and any Reply Brief supporting the Motion due 15 days after submission of the defendants brief. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
70 70 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/26 9:47 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiffs Hoeg, Duriseti, Kheriaty, Mazolewski, and Khatibi by Ram Duriseti, Tracy Hoeg, Azadeh Khatibi, Aaron Kheriaty, Pete Mazolewski.(Younes, Jenin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order