Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:22-cv-01446
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
FirstCollect, Inc.
Represented By
Josiah Rodney Wolcott
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tunnell & Raysor, P.A.
Represented By
Josiah Rodney Wolcott
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Augustus James Gallagher
Represented By
Mary Higgins
Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 31, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/31 10:43 AM
ORDER of Dismissal re9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Augustus James Gallagher, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/31/23. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/30 3:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Augustus James Gallagher.(Higgins, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 23, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Mon 01/23 3:37 PM
Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Mary Higgins, Esq. regarding Status Letter. (Higgins, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
order SO ORDERED Tue 01/10 9:25 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 1/20/2023 filed by Augustus James Gallagher. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/10/23. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 01/09 10:54 AM
Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 1/20/2023 - filed by Augustus James Gallagher. (Higgins, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
order SO ORDERED Mon 12/19 11:39 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to January 6, 2023 filed by FirstCollect, Inc., Tunnell & Raysor, P.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/19/22. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
6 6 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 12/15 10:42 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to January 6, 2023 - filed by FirstCollect, Inc., Tunnell & Raysor, P.A.. (Wolcott, Josiah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/10 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Augustus James Gallagher.FirstCollect, Inc. served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (Higgins, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/10 10:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Augustus James Gallagher.Tunnell & Raysor, P.A. served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Higgins, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/09 1:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/03 11:24 AM
Summons Issued as to FirstCollect, Inc. on 11/3/2022; Tunnell & Raysor, P.A. on 11/3/2022.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 11/03 11:23 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against FirstCollect, Inc., Tunnell & Raysor, P.A. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3997783.) - filed by Augustus James Gallagher.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet