California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:22-cv-06821
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
McLane Company, Inc.
Defendant
Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant
eLiquitech, Inc.
Defendant
Riaz Valani
Defendant
Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Defendant
Nicholas Pritzker
Defendant
Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Defendant
Mother Murphys Labs, Inc.
Defendant
James Monsees
Defendant
Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
Defendant
Ho Young Huh
Defendant
Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Defendant
Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Defendant
Adam Bowen
Defendant
Altria Group, Inc.
Defendant
Altria Group Distribution Company
Defendant
Altria Enterprises, LLC
Defendant
Altria Client Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Wyatt Harrington
Represented By
Emily Catherine Jeffcott
Morgan & Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
utility MDL Member Case Closed Fri 07/19 8:40 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, civil case no. 22-06821 is terminated. cc: JPMDL (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
7 7 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/09 1:36 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting (4216) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:19-md-02913-WHO. Associated Cases: 3:19-md-02913-WHO, 3:19-cv-06565-WHO, 3:19-cv-06927-WHO, 3:19-cv-08311-WHO, 3:20-cv-00109-WHO, 3:20-cv-00262-WHO, 3:20-cv-00908-WHO, 3:20-cv-01146-WHO, 3:20-cv-01160-WHO, 3:20-cv-01315-WHO, 3:20-cv-01369-WHO, 3:20-cv-01718-WHO, 3:20-cv-02375-WHO, 3:20-cv-02656-WHO, 3:20-cv-02701-WHO, 3:20-cv-02799-WHO, 3:20-cv-02822-WHO, 3:20-cv-03428-WHO, 3:20-cv-03738-WHO, 3:20-cv-04361-WHO, 3:20-cv-05275-WHO, 3:20-cv-05692-WHO, 3:20-cv-05731-WHO, 3:20-cv-06070-WHO, 3:20-cv-06083-WHO, 3:20-cv-06135-WHO, 3:20-cv-06601-WHO, 3:20-cv-07091-WHO, 3:20-cv-07500-WHO, 3:20-cv-07745-WHO, 3:20-cv-08299-WHO, 3:20-cv-08333-WHO, 3:20-cv-08342-WHO, 3:20-cv-08510-WHO, 3:20-cv-08660-WHO, 3:20-cv-08820-WHO, 3:20-cv-08919-WHO, 3:20-cv-08927-WHO, 3:20-cv-09069-WHO, 3:20-cv-09121-WHO, 3:20-cv-09129-WHO, 3:20-cv-09192-WHO, 3:21-cv-00563-WHO, 3:21-cv-00878-WHO, 3:21-cv-01321-WHO, 3:21-cv-02034-WHO, 3:21-cv-02963-WHO, 3:21-cv-04046-WHO, 3:21-cv-04070-WHO, 3:21-cv-04713-WHO, 3:21-cv-04752-WHO, 3:21-cv-04798-WHO, 3:21-cv-05051-WHO, 3:21-cv-05553-WHO, 3:21-cv-05676-WHO, 3:21-cv-05918-WHO, 3:21-cv-05960-WHO, 3:21-cv-06373-WHO, 3:21-cv-06413-WHO, 3:21-cv-07455-WHO, 3:21-cv-07976-WHO, 3:21-cv-08076-WHO, 3:21-cv-08418-WHO, 3:21-cv-08662-WHO, 3:21-cv-08851-WHO, 3:21-cv-09123-WHO, 3:21-cv-09315-WHO, 3:21-cv-09533-WHO, 3:21-cv-09607-WHO, 3:21-cv-09692-WHO, 3:22-cv-00045-WHO, 3:22-cv-00247-WHO, 3:22-cv-00336-WHO, 3:22-cv-01658-WHO, 3:22-cv-02019-WHO, 3:22-cv-02211-WHO, 3:22-cv-02264-WHO, 3:22-cv-02518-WHO, 3:22-cv-03735-WHO, 3:22-cv-04220-WHO, 3:22-cv-04333-WHO, 3:22-cv-04384-WHO, 3:22-cv-04527-WHO, 3:22-cv-04666-WHO, 3:22-cv-05534-WHO, 3:22-cv-05545-WHO, 3:22-cv-05586-WHO, 3:22-cv-05590-WHO, 3:22-cv-05645-WHO, 3:22-cv-05650-WHO, 3:22-cv-05673-WHO, 3:22-cv-05681-WHO, 3:22-cv-05684-WHO, 3:22-cv-05704-WHO, 3:22-cv-05709-WHO, 3:22-cv-05715-WHO, 3:22-cv-05729-WHO, 3:22-cv-05751-WHO, 3:22-cv-05846-WHO, 3:22-cv-05909-WHO, 3:22-cv-05914-WHO, 3:22-cv-05916-WHO, 3:22-cv-06107-WHO, 3:22-cv-06151-WHO, 3:22-cv-06253-WHO, 3:22-cv-06266-WHO, 3:22-cv-06274-WHO, 3:22-cv-06276-WHO, 3:22-cv-06281-WHO, 3:22-cv-06283-WHO, 3:22-cv-06338-WHO, 3:22-cv-06341-WHO, 3:22-cv-06346-WHO, 3:22-cv-06368-WHO, 3:22-cv-06415-WHO, 3:22-cv-06447-WHO, 3:22-cv-06465-WHO, 3:22-cv-06476-WHO, 3:22-cv-06494-WHO, 3:22-cv-06576-WHO, 3:22-cv-06592-WHO, 3:22-cv-06649-WHO, 3:22-cv-06653-WHO, 3:22-cv-06657-WHO, 3:22-cv-06697-WHO, 3:22-cv-06720-WHO, 3:22-cv-06741-WHO, 3:22-cv-06773-WHO, 3:22-cv-06788-WHO, 3:22-cv-06790-WHO, 3:22-cv-06805-WHO, 3:22-cv-06807-WHO, 3:22-cv-06809-WHO, 3:22-cv-06821-WHO, 3:22-cv-06831-WHO, 3:22-cv-06850-WHO, 3:22-cv-06919-WHO, 3:22-cv-06924-WHO, 3:22-cv-06942-WHO, 3:22-cv-07109-WHO, 3:22-cv-07111-WHO, 3:22-cv-07112-WHO, 3:22-cv-07384-WHO, 3:22-cv-07555-WHO, 3:22-cv-07574-WHO, 3:22-cv-07579-WHO, 3:22-cv-07583-WHO, 3:22-cv-07767-WHO, 3:22-cv-07804-WHO, 3:22-cv-07816-WHO, 3:22-cv-07817-WHO, 3:22-cv-07828-WHO, 3:22-cv-07831-WHO, 3:22-cv-07847-WHO, 3:22-cv-07873-WHO, 3:22-cv-07936-WHO, 3:22-cv-07968-WHO, 3:22-cv-07977-WHO, 3:22-cv-07982-WHO, 3:22-cv-07997-WHO(jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 06/27 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wyatt Harrington (Jeffcott, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/01 6:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wyatt Harrington (Jeffcott, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 11/04 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Enterprises, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, Juul Labs, Inc, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphys Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (kkp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
3 3 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 11/03 11:58 AM
Proposed Summons.(Jeffcott, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix List of Defendants to be served
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17694546.). Filed byWyatt Harrington.(Jeffcott, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/03 1:26 PM
Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 11/04 1:49 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 19-2913 Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-06821-WHO cc: JPMDL. (kkp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]