California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:22-cv-06825
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC
Plaintiff
Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 28, 2023
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/28 9:35 AM
NOTICE by Penn-Star Insurance Company re24 Order on Report and Recommendations of Entry of Judgment(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Judgment [Doc 24]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 08/03 3:47 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/03 3:36 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
22 22 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 04/28 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Penn-Star Insurance Company re19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Federal Express - Proof of Delivery,
Att: 2 Exhibit Federal Express - Proof of Delivery
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/26 9:33 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/23.(as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Friday, April 21, 2023
20 20 order Order Reassigning Case 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/21 7:42 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/20/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
19 19 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 04/20 6:23 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company Objections due by 5/4/2023. In the attached report and recommendation, the court directs reassignment of the case to a district judge and recommends that the district judge grant the motion for default judgment of (1) $14,306.14 for attorney's fees and costs in the Texas litigation and (2) costs of $567.95. The plaintiff's proposed judgment at ECF No. 11-2 can be entered as a separate judgment. The court asks the plaintiff to serve the report and recommendation on the defaulting defendant in the same same manner that it did for the default-judgment motion and to file proof of service on the docket. The report and recommendation also sets forth the process for objections. (Beeler, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 03/23 3:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/30/2023 is reset to 4/27/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
17 17 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 02/24 4:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 2/23/2023. No defendant appearing. Court to issue order. Total Time in Court: 2 minutes. Digital Recording Time: 10:27 - 10:29. Plaintiff's Attorney: Limor Lehavi. Defendant Attorney: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2023)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
16 16 oth_sup Brief Fri 02/03 10:52 AM
Brief In Support of Penn-Star Insurance Company's Motion To Enter Judgment By Default Against Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC Submitted In Response To Dkt 15 re15 Order,13 Declaration in Support,12 Declaration in Support,11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Related [+] (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-] 15 ,13 ,12 ,11
Att: 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Limor Lehavi in Support of Request for Judgment by Default
Sunday, January 29, 2023
15 15 7 pgs order Order Sun 01/29 5:38 PM
ORDER.<>In the attached order, the court flags potential issues regarding service and missing declarations and exhibits. The court asks for an update about the issues by 2/6/2023. (Beeler, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
13 13 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 01/09 11:19 AM
Declaration of Limor Lehavi in Support of11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC filed byPenn-Star Insurance Company. Related [+] (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 01/09 11:17 AM
Declaration in Support of11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC of Cheryl Mawby filed byPenn-Star Insurance Company. Related [+] (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Default Judgment - by the Court Mon 01/09 11:15 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/23/2023. Replies due by 1/30/2023.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 01/09 12:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING BY ZOOM: Motion Hearing11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC set for 2/23/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar . Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/2/2023 is reset to 3/30/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:h ttps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Tue 12/13 11:28 AM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)9
Thursday, December 01, 2022
9 9 motion Entry of Default Thu 12/01 8:29 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Limor Lehavi
Saturday, November 12, 2022
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sat 11/12 11:17 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Penn-Star Insurance Company.. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 11/12 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 11/04 5:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 11/04 5:50 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 11/03 12:28 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/03 12:25 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Penn-Star Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity Limited for Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Reimbursement against Nugentec Oilfield Chemicals LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17694693.). Filed byPenn-Star Insurance Company.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/03 12:23 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]