New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Samantha D Elliott
Case #: 1:22-cv-00456
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Terminated:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc.
101 State Street
Scrantn, IA 51462
Represented By
Brian P. Voke
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Todd Harrington
by Allied Eastern Indemnity Co., as Subrogee 26 Sunrise Drive
Shelburne, NH 03581
Represented By
Michael K. O'Neil
Rath, Young And Pignatelli PC
contact info
Janelle Fulton
Devine Timoney Law Group
contact info
Patrick C. Timoney
Devine Timoney Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
22 22 notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/09 10:15 AM
///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Dismiss claims with prejudice by Jeffery Todd Harrington(Timoney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/09 2:25 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (vln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 09/27 3:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Time to disclose experts and to extend certain other deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
21 21 motion Extend Time Tue 09/26 8:59 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to disclose experts and to extend certain other deadlines filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington.(Hage, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Form 3
Thursday, August 10, 2023
20 20 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 08/10 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Michael McNamee on behalf of Jeffery Todd Harrington Attorney Gregory Michael McNamee added to party Jeffery Todd Harrington(pty:pla).(McNamee, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/09 11:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion for Gregory M. McNamee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/03 3:40 PM
Assented to MOTION for Gregory M. McNamee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2406928.) filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington. Attorney Jamie N. Hage added to party Jeffery Todd Harrington(pty:pla).(Hage, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
18 18 notice Attorney Withdrawal Fri 07/28 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Janelle Fulton on behalf of Jeffery Todd Harrington(Fulton, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
notice Trial Notice Wed 03/15 9:48 AM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 10/16/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Pretrial Statements due 9/11/2024. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/25/2024. (vln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan Wed 03/15 9:11 AM
ORDER re : 15 Discovery Plan. ; and 16 Discovery Plan. With limited exception, the proposed discovery plans are denied and the operative scheduling order shall be as detailed in the attached order. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(vln)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference Tue 03/14 11:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2023 via video. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Janelle Fulton; Michael K. O'Neil) (Defts Atty: Brian P. Voke) (Tape #9:58)(Total Hearing Time: 50 Min) (bd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Wed 03/08 1:42 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. Location Change only. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO for 3/14/2023 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Duhamel, Brier)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
16 16 motion Discovery Plan Tue 03/07 5:28 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Discovery Plan Tue 03/07 5:18 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Voke, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reassigned Tue 03/07 9:10 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Reason for Reassignment: No Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. The new case designation is: 1:22-cv-00456-SE. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (Duhamel, Brier)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
14 14 misc Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 03/06 4:01 PM
NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
13 13 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 01/04 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janelle Fulton on behalf of Jeffery Todd Harrington Attorney Janelle Fulton added to party Jeffery Todd Harrington(pty:pla).(Fulton, Janelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 01/04 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Timoney on behalf of Jeffery Todd Harrington Attorney Patrick C. Timoney added to party Jeffery Todd Harrington(pty:pla).(Timoney, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/28 8:47 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Janelle Fulton to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Patrick C. Timoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/21 3:39 PM
Assented to MOTION for Patrick C. Timoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2326074.) filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington.(O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/21 3:25 PM
Assented to MOTION for Janelle Fulton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2326066.) filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington.(O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
notice Pretrial Conference Mon 12/19 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference reset for 3/14/2023 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/7/2023. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
9 9 motion Continue Fri 12/16 1:17 PM
Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 12/30/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Voke, Brian)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 12/19 8:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 12/06 9:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc. filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington. Served/Mailed on 11/14/2022. Answer Follow Up on 12/5/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 12/05 3:52 PM
Disclosure Statement by Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Voke, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement Mon 12/05 3:40 PM
Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc. identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Voke, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/05 3:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Voke, Brian)
Related: [-]
notice Pretrial Conference Mon 12/05 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/6/2023. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
4 4 service Summons - Waiver Issued Fri 11/04 12:18 PM
Summons issued electronically as to Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (ed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF,
Att: 2 Assignment to Magistrate
3 3 notice Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 11/04 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 12/27/2022.(ed)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - ECF Fri 11/04 11:53 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 11/03 4:04 PM
Disclosure Statement by Jeffery Todd Harrington disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 11/03 3:58 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNHDC-2309878 filed by Jeffery Todd Harrington.(O'Neil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver
utility Case Assigned Fri 11/04 11:51 AM
Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-456-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
Related: [-]