California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:22-cv-06851
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 2:20 AM PDT
Defendant
SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC.
Represented By
Daniel B. Chammas
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
WEB TO DOOR CORP.
Represented By
Ellen Claire Arabian-Lee
Arabian-Lee Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Andrew Paul Frederick
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GABRIEL AROCHA
Represented By
Chaim Shaun Setareh
Setareh Law Group
contact info
Jose Maria Dominado Patino, Jr
Setareh Law Group
contact info
Maxim Gorbunov
Setareh Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 07, 2022
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/07 5:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GABRIEL AROCHA.. (Patino, Jose Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 11/04 1:56 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17695978.). Filed byGABRIEL AROCHA.(Setareh, Chaim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/03 3:43 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]