District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:22-cv-03260
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2022
Terminated:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 04, 2022 11:09 PM EDT
Petitioner
BRIAN KEITH MCELROY
R#5003458 BREVARD COUNTY JAIL c/o Smart Communications P.O. Box 9145
Seminole, FL 33775
Respondent
LAKE COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Respondent
LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, ET AL
Respondent
MADISON JWP POLICE DEPARTMENT PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE
Respondent
PAINESVILLE MUNICIPLE COURT


Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
20 20 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/15 3:27 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re19 Leave to File Denied, Sent to BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
19 19 order Leave to File Denied Wed 02/22 12:21 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Brian McElroy; Complaint. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail."Leave to file DENIED. 22-cv-3260 and 22-cv-3261 dismissed and closed on 1/4/23." Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2023. (zrtw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
18 18 misc Mail Returned Wed 02/08 3:07 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re15 Leave to File Denied, Sent to Brian McElroy; Resent to New Address: Unknown. (zrtw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
17 17 misc Mail Returned Tue 01/31 4:08 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re14 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case,13 Memorandum & Opinion Sent to BRIAN KEITH MCELROY; Resent to New Address: P.O. Box 9145, Seminole, FL 33775. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
16 16 order Leave to File Denied Thu 01/26 9:39 AM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- BRIAN KEITH MCELROY-MOTION. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED and Civ. Nos. 22-3260 and 22-3261 were dismissed 1/4/23." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/24/2023. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
15 15 order Leave to File Denied Thu 01/19 10:06 AM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- BRIAN KEITH MCELROY; Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to file DENIED. Cases dismissed and closed on 1/4/2023." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/13/2023. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Mon 01/09 12:22 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/04/2023. (zsl)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 01/09 12:20 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/04/2023. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
12 12 motion Suppress Thu 12/29 3:07 PM
MOTION to Suppress by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 12/21 1:10 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, Sent to BRIAN KEITH MCELROY; Resent to New Address: Unknown; Unable to forward. (zljn) Modified on 12/21/2022 (zljn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
8 8 motion Motion For Order Mon 12/19 12:23 PM
MOTION for Order by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 12/07 5:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed petitioner's motion to appoint counsel and having weighed the factors set forth in Local Civil Rule 83.11(b)(3), the Court determines that appointment of counsel is not warranted at this early stage of proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that petitioner's motion6 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to any renewed motion in this Court, or in another federal district court if this matter is transferred. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/7/22. (psu2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
10 10 motion Trial Motion For Order Mon 12/19 12:41 PM
MOTION for Trial, MOTION for Order by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (znmw)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Partial Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 12/19 12:41 PM
PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 12/06 2:13 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (zljn)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 12/06 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by BRIAN KEITH MCELROY. (See docket entry6 to view document). (zljn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
5 5 order Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement Thu 12/01 8:04 AM
PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/30/2022. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
4 4 misc Mail Returned Wed 11/23 1:57 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application. Sent to Brian Keith McElroy; Resent to New Address: Unknown; Unable to forward. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Thu 11/03 2:35 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/24/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsl)
Related: [-]