District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:22-cv-03340
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2023 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
LISA P. COHEN
Plaintiff
NEIL J. COHEN
5376 28th St. N.W.
Washington, DC 20015


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Sunday, November 20, 2022
order .Order Sun 11/20 12:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Having considered Plaintiff's5 Stipulation of Dismissal, it is hereby ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/2022. (lcja)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/18 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEIL J. COHEN (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/16 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 12/9/2022. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
4 4 order .Order Tue 11/15 3:09 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause by December 9, 2022, why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at his address of record. NEIL J. COHEN, 5376 28th St. N.W., Washington, DC 20015 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/15/2022. (lcja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
3 3 order .Order Wed 11/09 4:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules, and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: NEIL J. COHEN 5376 28th St. N.W., Washington, DC 20015. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/09/2022. (lcja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
2 2 misc Affidavit Tue 11/08 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (zjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT against LISA P. COHEN ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 203335) filed by NEIL J. COHEN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjm)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Thu 11/03 9:47 AM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to LISA P. COHEN (zjm)
Related: [-]