Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-34114

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:22-ap-03316
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeffrey Bardwell
Represented By
Jeffrey Bardwell
contact info
Plaintiff
Valaris PLC
Represented By
Joseph P Briggett
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Valaris plc
Represented By
Valaris plc
contact info
Plaintiff
ENSCO Limited
Represented By
Joseph P Briggett
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
ENSCO Incorporated
5847 San Felipe Street Suite 3300
Houston, TX 77057
Represented By
Joseph P Briggett
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
25 25 notice Notice Mon 10/30 4:46 PM
Notice of Appearance of Blair Dancy . Filed by Jeffrey Bardwell (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Generic Order
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
23 23 order Generic Order Wed 04/05 4:32 PM
Order Abating Proceeding, Signed on 4/5/2023 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, Case No. 20-34114 ECF No. 1387
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
22 22 motion Emergency Motion Tue 04/04 2:48 PM
Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Declaring Claims Discharged and Barred Filed by Jeffrey Bardwell (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Wed 03/22 5:01 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by ENSCO Incorporated, ENSCO Limited, Valaris PLC, Valaris plc (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 -Statement of Uncontested Facts
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
20 20 court Document Tue 02/28 2:54 PM
Notice of Cancellation of Conference. Related [+] Parties notified. The conference previously scheduled for 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM is *canceled.* (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 12 Order for Conference
Friday, February 24, 2023
19 19 court Document (Adversary) Fri 02/24 8:28 AM
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing. Related [+] The hearing previously scheduled for 2/24/2023 at 10:00 AM is *canceled.* (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, January 30, 2023
court Hearing Cont Mon 01/30 11:57 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status conference to be held on 2/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, January 05, 2023
court Hearing Set Thu 01/05 3:20 PM
Status Conference Set On Related [+] Hearing previously scheduled for 1/12/2023 is canceled on the record; continued as a status conference. Status conference to be held on 2/10/2023 at 08:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, December 05, 2022
18 18 notice Notice Mon 12/05 4:01 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey Bardwell (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
17 17 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/05 3:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Jeffrey Bardwell Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2023 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Chapple, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate Tue 11/15 4:16 PM
Certificate CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Filed By ENSCO Incorporated, ENSCO Limited, Valaris PLC, Valaris plc ) Related [+] (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 Order for Conference
Friday, November 11, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/11 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order for Conference
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
12 12 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Wed 11/09 11:28 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/08 4:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jeffrey Bardwell 11/4/2022. (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/07 8:28 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Delos E. Flint, Jr. Related [+] Signed on 11/7/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/07 8:27 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Destinee F. Ramos Related [+] Signed on 11/7/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 6
Sunday, November 06, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/06 10:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Friday, November 04, 2022
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/04 10:54 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice FOR DELOS E. FLINT, JR. . Filed by ENSCO Incorporated, ENSCO Limited, Valaris PLC (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/04 10:49 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice FOR DESTINEE F. RAMOS . Filed by ENSCO Incorporated, ENSCO Limited, Valaris PLC (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued Fri 11/04 10:27 AM
Summons Issued on Jeffrey Bardwell Date Issued 11/4/2022. (hler)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/04 7:42 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Joseph P. Briggett Related [+] Signed on 11/4/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, November 03, 2022
3 3 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 11/03 4:26 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joseph P. Briggett . Filed by ENSCO Incorporated, ENSCO Limited, Valaris PLC (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 11/03 4:24 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Jeffrey Bardwell. (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 11/03 4:21 PM
Adversary case 22-03316 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Valaris PLC, Valaris plc, ENSCO Limited, ENSCO Incorporated against Jeffrey Bardwell. Fee Amount $350 (Briggett, Joseph)
Related: [-]