California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:22-cv-08091
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2022
Terminated:Nov 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 2:44 AM PDT
Defendant
GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By
Lilly Nizam
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Robert Kenneth Dixon
Sanders Roberts LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midea America Corp.
Represented By
Jeffrey A Swedo
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Raymond Lawrence Gill
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midea Group Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Toshiba Corporation
Defendant
Toshiba Lifestyle Products and Services Corporation
Defendant
Toshiba Logistics America, Inc.
Represented By
Chariese Reanne Solorio
Snell And Wilmer LLP
contact info
David P. Hansen
Snell And Wilmer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Susanne Drumheller
Represented By
Hunter Norton
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Jesse Max Creed
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Brian J Panish
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Durell Mike-Price
Represented By
Hunter Norton
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Jesse Max Creed
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Brian J Panish
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnna Mike-Price
Represented By
Hunter Norton
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Jesse Max Creed
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Brian J Panish
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
C. M.-P.
Represented By
Hunter Norton
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Jesse Max Creed
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info
Brian J Panish
Panish Shea Boyle Ravipudi LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
14 14 misc Receipt Wed 11/23 4:18 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
13 13 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 11/10 12:08 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number: 22STCV29728. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
12 12 order Remand Case to State Court Thu 11/10 12:07 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court finds that Defendants' conclusory assertions are too speculative, and fail to plausibly allege that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Accordingly, the Court is not satisfied that Defendants have satisfied their burden of plausibly alleging that the amount in controversy meets the jurisdictional requirement. In light of the foregoing, the action is hereby remanded to state court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
11 11 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/08 6:36 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Susanne Drumheller, C. M.-P., Durell Mike-Price, Johnna Mike-Price.(Creed, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11/08 4:39 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. (jre)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 11/08 4:32 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
8 8 misc Joinder Mon 11/07 3:19 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendant Toshiba Lifestyle Products and Services Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,1 . (Gill, Raymond)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 11/07 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: It appears the name of an individual known to be a minor is contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R Civ P 5.2(a) requires that a minor's initials (as opposed to a minor's spell-out name) be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 11/07 10:05 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 11/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 11/07 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/04 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Midea America Corp., identifying Midea Electrics Netherlands B.V. (Direct Parent Company); Midea Group Co., Ltd. (Indirect Parent Company); Allianz Jingdong General Insurance Company Ltd. (Insurance Carrier). (Gill, Raymond)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/04 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Midea America Corp.. (Gill, Raymond)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/04 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV29728 Receipt No: ACACDC-34278619 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Midea America Corp.. (Attorney Raymond Lawrence Gill added to party Midea America Corp.(pty:dft))(Gill, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Raymond L. Gill in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A1 - Summons,
Att: 3 19 pgs Exhibit A2 - Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit A3 - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit A4 - Civil Cover Sheet Addendum,
Att: 6 Exhibit A5 - Notice of Case Asssignment,
Att: 7 Exhibit A6 - App for Guardian Ad Litem,
Att: 8 Exhibit A7 - 7th Amended Standing Order,
Att: 9 Exhibit A8 - 8th Amended Standing Order,
Att: 10 Exhibit A9 - ADR Packet,
Att: 11 Exhibit A10 - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Guidelines,
Att: 12 Exhibit A11 - Proof of Service on Midea America Corp.,
Att: 13 Exhibit A12 - Proof of Service Toshiba Lifestyle,
Att: 14 Exhibit A13 - Proof of Service Toshia Logisitics,
Att: 15 Exhibit A14 - Toshia Corporation,
Att: 16 Exhibit A15 - Proof of Service Home Depot,
Att: 17 Exhibit A16 - Motion to Quash,
Att: 18 Exhibit A17 - Home Depot Answer to Complaint,
Att: 19 Exhibit A18 - State Court Docket,
Att: 20 Exhibit B - Midea Ameria Corp Objection to Plaintiffs' Service on Toshiba Lifestyle,
Att: 21 Exhibit C1 - Decl of D Vellema in Suppor of Removal,
Att: 22 Exhibit C2 - Decl of J Huang in Support of Removal,
Att: 23 Exhibit D - Jury Verdict Research,
Att: 24 Exhibit E1 - Toshiba Corporation Consent to Removal,
Att: 25 Exhibit E2 - Toshiba Logistics Consent to Removal,
Att: 26 Exhibit E3 - Home Depot Consent to Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 11/07 10:23 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd., Home Depot USA, Inc., Midea America Corp., Midea Group Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Lifestyle Products and Services Corporation, Toshiba Logistics America, Inc..(Filing fee $ 402) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs C. M.-P., Durell Mike-Price, Susanne Drumheller, Johnna Mike-Price. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/13/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/07 10:26 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff C. M.-P., Durell Mike-Price, Susanne Drumheller, Johnna Mike-Price, upon Defendant Toshiba Logistics America, Inc. served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Junko Makino-Chief Financial Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/6/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) Modified on 11/7/2022 (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/07 10:29 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff C. M.-P., Durell Mike-Price, Susanne Drumheller, Johnna Mike-Price, upon Defendant Toshiba Corporation served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maggie Jenkins-Senior Counsel Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/12/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/07 10:33 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff C. M.-P., Durell Mike-Price, Susanne Drumheller, Johnna Mike-Price, upon Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Lai Saevang-Agent Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/12/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 11/07 10:36 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
Related: [-]