Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:22-mj-02104
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Adrian Almanza (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Material Witness
Eugenia Santana-Hernandez
Represented By
Jose Luis Ramos
Ramos Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 11/05/2022 2:50 AM CDT
Thursday, November 03, 2022
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Adrian Almanza (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 11/4/2022 at 10:03 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (VeronicaMadrigal, 5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Adrian Almanza, filed.(VeronicaMadrigal, 5)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Eugenia Santana-Hernandez as to Adrian Almanza. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 11/4/2022 at 10:03 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga, filed.(VeronicaMadrigal, 5)
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on November 3, 2022 at 09:20 AM as to Adrian Almanza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (VeronicaMadrigal, 5)
Related: [-]