Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:22-cv-23635
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
MAVEN MED, INC.
a California Corporation PRAMANIK BHARADWAJ 844 S. BRAMBLE WAY
ANAHEIM, CA 92808
Plaintiff
WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.
a Florida Corporation 10300 SW 72 STREET STE 235
MIAMI, FL 33173
Represented By
Robert A. Rosenblatt
Law Offices Of Robert A. Rosenblatt, P.A.
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 18 Amended Motion for Default Judgment filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (mkr) Modified text (adding Amended) on 6/16/2023 (mr1).
GPO Jun 30 2023
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: DENYING 18 Motion for Default Judgment. DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Amended Complaint due by 7/28/2023. ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr., on 6/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)

Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Thursday, January 26, 2023
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 01/26 9:01 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re18 MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Wed 01/25 3:27 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. Responses due by 2/8/2023 (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/13 1:50 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER regarding14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment. The Undersigned notes Plaintiff's motion contains no analysis, no case law, and no citations to the paragraph numbers or the exhibits of the Complaint. "Courts in this circuit routinely deny motions for default judgment which contain no substantive analysis." The Elie Neufeld, LLC v. Edward Wolf & Associates, LLC , No. 22-23204 CIV, 2022 WL 18144065, at *1 (S.D. Fla. Dec. 8, 2022), report and recommendation adopted sub nom. The Elie Neufeld, LLC v. Edward Wolf & Assocs., LLC, No. 22-23204 CIV, 2023 WL 122659 (S.D. Fla. Jan. 6, 2023). In Valle v. AA & K Restoration Grp., LLC , for instance, the Court observed that "a proper motion for default judgment should 'state in the liability section of its memorandum of law the elements of each cause of action on which it seeks a default judgment and show with pinpoint citations to the amended complaint how the well-pleaded facts in the amended complaint establish each element.'" No. 1:19-CV-20873-KMM, 2019 WL 13192198, at *2 (S.D. Fla. Oct. 23, 2019) (quoting Jaguar Imports, LLC v. Phoenix Glob. Ventures, Inc. , No. 6:12-cv-1486-OrL-31KRS, 2013 WL 12170484, at *1 (M.D. Fla. Mar. 21, 2013)). Therefore, by no later than Friday, January 27, 2023, Plaintiff will file a memorandum of law supported by case law and containing specific citations to the record (including the paragraph numbers of the Complaint and specific pages of the exhibits to the Complaint). If necessary, Plaintiff will file, by the same deadline, a more detailed affidavit from Joseph E. Doyle. This matter is set for an in-person, evidentiary hearing on Friday, April 14, 2023 at 10:00 AM before the Undersigned. The parties shall be prepared to present evidence (including any witness testimony) and legal argument. The motion seeks to recover certain costs. But, the evidentiary hearing will be on the amount of damages, not attorney's fees and costs. A motion seeking fees and costs is premature, as there is no judgment yet. See P & L Towing & Transportation, Inc. v. M/V Gardens , No. 21-23062 CIV, 2022 WL 1801235 (S.D. Fla. June 2, 2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/13/2023. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/23 2:42 PM
NOTICE by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. re15 Order Referring Motion, notice of filing (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Wed 12/21 10:50 AM
ORDER REFERRING14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. Motion referred to Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr., on 12/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
14 14 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/14 2:20 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
13 13 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Tue 12/13 1:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to MAVEN MED, INC. - Motions Terminated:12 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/13/2022. (pcs)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/13 12:22 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to MAVEN MED, INC. by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Acknowledgment of Service Fri 11/18 12:53 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.., ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE AMENDED NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
10 10 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 11/16 10:18 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 11/15 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to MAVEN MED, INC.. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
9 9 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 11/15 2:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters and Settlement. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 11/14 2:40 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.., SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. MAVEN MED, INC. served on 11/12/2022, response/answer due 12/5/2022. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 11/14 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Sudha Bharadwaj by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. re1 Complaint, filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 11/07 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to MAVEN MED, INC. (pcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 11/07 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. re1 Complaint, filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. (Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (aao)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/07 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against MAVEN MED, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16081356, filed by WORLDWIDE DISTRIBUTORS, INC..(Rosenblatt, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/07 9:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
Related: [-]
order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Mon 11/07 9:34 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (aao)
Related: [-]