Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita M Boor
Case #: 3:22-cv-00633
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas M. Staunton
Miller Shakman Levine & Feldman LLP
contact info
Naikang Tsao
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
William Kerwin Lane, III
Wiley LLP
contact info
Rebecca J Fiebig
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Rachel Ann Alexander
Wiley Rein, LLP
contact info
Jamie A Stock-Retzloff
Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/07 11:25 PM
Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 01/04 9:30 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Because plaintiff indicates no opposition to defendant's motion to stay and compel arbitration (dkt. #33 ) that motion is GRANTED. The action is STAYED pending arbitration with defendant continuing to continue performing all of its services under the parties' agreements until such time as the merits are finally determined, consistent with the court's previous order. (Dkt. # 31 ) Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/4/2022. (voc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
38 38 respm Response Stating No Opposition Fri 12/16 12:23 PM
Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:33 Motion to Compel filed by MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Wed 12/14 8:25 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
36 36 misc Redacted Document Fri 12/09 10:40 AM
Redaction to34 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Seal Fri 12/09 10:38 AM
Motion to Seal Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action Pending Arbitration (dkt. #34) by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Brief in Support Fri 12/09 10:35 AM
Brief in Support of33 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. ( Sealed Document ) (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Compel Fri 12/09 10:33 AM
Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 12/16/2022. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 12/09 11:33 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting35 Motion to Seal Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay or Dismiss Action Pending Arbitration (dkt. 34 ) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/9/2022. (rks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
order Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/29 8:54 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting28 Motion to Admit Rachel Ann Alexander Pro Hac Vice; granting30 Motion to Admit Thomas M. Staunton Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/29/2022. (lak)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
30 30 motion Admit Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/28 12:36 PM
Motion to Admit Thomas M. Staunton Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3160279.) by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Staunton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Brief in Opposition Mon 11/28 11:02 AM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:26 Motion for Leave to File filed by MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Admit Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/28 10:44 AM
Motion to Admit Rachel Ann Alexander Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3160209.) by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Alexander, Rachel) (Main Document 28 replaced on 11/28/2022) (jls)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Exhibit Mon 11/28 9:03 AM
Exhibit to26 Motion for Leave to File filed by MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Answer the Complaint (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Mon 11/28 8:48 AM
Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Answer the Complaint by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
order Text Only Order Mon 11/28 4:31 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Contingent on defendant MedImpact's agreement to continue performing all of its services under the parties' agreements until such time as the merits of plaintiff Quartz's petition for injunctive relief (dkt. #7 ) is decided by this court, or, if the court determines that it does not have jurisdiction over Quartz's petition, by an arbitral tribunal of competent jurisdiction, MedImpact's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint and Quartz's motion for preliminary injunction are extended to December 9, 2022. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/28/2022. (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
25 25 respm Declaration Fri 11/25 3:51 PM
Declaration of Rebecca J. Fiebig filed by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines re:23 MOTION for Extension of Time, (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence between counsel regarding extension
24 24 respm Brief in Opposition Fri 11/25 3:46 PM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:23 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/23 3:08 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Answer the Complaint by Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/30/2022. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/23 3:21 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to23 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Answer the Complaint . Response due by noon on 11/28/2022. (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/22 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Naikang Tsao for Defendant MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. (Tsao, Naikang)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/11 9:25 AM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. served on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Lane, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
order Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/09 9:32 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting5 Motion to Admit William K. Lane, III Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/9/2022. (lak)
Related: [-]
order Text Only Order Wed 11/09 11:49 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.'s motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #7 ). Defendant must file any objection and response to proposed findings of fact by November 29, 2022. The court will then hold a videoconference hearing on December 6, 2022, at 10:00 am. This schedule is subject to plaintiff's filing proof of formal service by November 11, 2022. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/9/2022. (voc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
17 17 respm Brief in Support Tue 11/08 3:29 PM
Brief in Support of16 Motion to Seal ECF Nos. 8, 9, 10, 11 by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Seal Tue 11/08 3:28 PM
Motion to Seal ECF Nos. 8, 9, 10, 11 by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Redacted Document Tue 11/08 3:14 PM
Redaction to11 Declaration of Beth Hebert-Silvia by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Redacted Document Tue 11/08 3:13 PM
Redaction to10 Declaration of Patrick Cory by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Redacted Document Tue 11/08 3:12 PM
Redaction to9 Proposed Findings of Fact,,, by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PBM RFP (excerpt),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2019 Agreement (excerpt),
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2020.06.02 J. Burns email to L. Cueto,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - MedImpact RFP Proposal Submission (excerpt),
Att: 5 Exhibit E - RTN Instructions,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Quartz MedImpact PBM Agreements (excerpt),
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 2022.05.24 C. Lewis Email to P. Cory,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 2022.05.26 C. Lewis Email to P. Cory,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 2022.05.26 P. Cory Email to C. Lewis,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - 2022. 07.20 P. Cory Email to L. Varrato,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - 2022.09.12 L. Varrato Letter to P. Cory,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - 2022.10.25 L. Varrato Letter to R. Fiebig,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - 2022.11.03 MedImpact Letter to Quartz,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - 2020.06.18 D. McKinley Email to J. Burns
12 12 misc Redacted Document Tue 11/08 3:02 PM
Redaction to8 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Declaration Tue 11/08 2:57 PM
Declaration of Beth Hebert-Silvia filed by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ( Sealed Document ) (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Declaration Tue 11/08 2:55 PM
Declaration of Patrick Cory filed by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ( Sealed Document ) (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Proposed Findings of Fact Tue 11/08 2:53 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. re:7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ( Sealed Document ) (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - PBM RFP (excerpt),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2019 Agreement (excerpt),
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2020.06.02 J. Burns email to L. Cueto,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - MedImpact RFP Proposal Submission (excerpt),
Att: 5 Exhibit E - RTN Instructions,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Quartz MedImpact PBM Agreements (excerpt),
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 2022.05.24 C. Lewis Email to P. Cory,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 2022.05.26 C. Lewis Email to P. Cory,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 2022.05.26 P. Cory Email to C. Lewis,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - 2022. 07.20 P. Cory Email to L. Varrato,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - 2022.09.12 L. Varrato Letter to P. Cory,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - 2022.10.25 L. Varrato Letter to R. Fiebig,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - 2022.11.03 MedImpact Letter to Quartz,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - 2020.06.18 D. McKinley Email to J. Burns
8 8 respm Brief in Support Tue 11/08 2:46 PM
Brief in Support of7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc. ( Sealed Document ) (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 11/08 2:42 PM
MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/08 2:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Admit Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/08 9:43 AM
Motion to Admit William Kerwin Lane, III Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3152889.) by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Lane, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/08 9:04 AM
Summons Issued as to MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Tue 11/08 9:03 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Tue 11/08 9:03 AM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/08 9:05 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting2 Motion to Admit Rebecca J. Fiebig Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/8/2022. (lak)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 11/08 3:33 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting16 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/8/2022. (voc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
2 2 motion Admit Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/07 7:43 PM
Motion to Admit Rebecca J Fiebig Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3152775.) by Plaintiff Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. (Fiebig, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/07 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against MedImpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3152693.), filed by Quartz Health Solutions, Inc.. (Stock-Retzloff, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet