Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Referred: Phillip J Caraballo
Case #: 3:22-cv-01768
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
AliExpress
Defendant
Wholesale In Motion Group, Inc.
Defendant
USimprints
Defendant
Staples Promotional Products
Defendant
Rakuten Americas
Defendant
Price US Wholesale
Defendant
DHGate
Defendant
Bonanza.com, Inc.
Defendant
AnyPromo Inc.
Defendant
Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Defendant
Walmart.com
Defendant
Walmart Stores, Inc.
Defendant
Does 1 Through 50
Defendant
Current Media Group Inc.
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff
David J. Catanzaro
286 Upper Powderly Street
Carbondale, PA 18407
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michaels Stores Procurement Company, Inc.
Terminated: 01/06/2023
Represented By
James D. Tuck
Dentons Us
contact info
Victor Calvin Johnson
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
David Russey
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michaels Stores, Inc.
Terminated: 02/22/2023
Represented By
James D. Tuck
Dentons Us
contact info
Victor Calvin Johnson
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
David Russey
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MSPCI
Terminated: 02/22/2023
Defendant
Diamond Vision Inc.
Terminated: 11/21/2022


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
123 123 misc Supplement Mon 04/21 2:11 PM
Supplement by David J. Catanzaro. to116 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Default Judgment,93 MOTION for Default Judgment. (ep)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/21 2:47 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 122 DELETED at request of filer as it was filed in error and refiled as Doc.23 ; (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
122 122 misc Supplement Fri 04/18 3:14 PM
Supplement by David J. Catanzaro. to116 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Default Judgment as to,93 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. (ep)
Related: [-]