Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-03132

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Duncan
Case #: 3:22-ap-80044
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2022
Terminated:Apr 11, 2023

Debtor
Terris Shirelle Riley
626 Stone Lion Drive
Durham, NC 27703
Represented By
J. Carolyn Stringer
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Terris Shirelle Riley
626 Stone Lion Drive
Durham, NC 27703
Represented By
Terris Shirelle Riley
contact info
Plaintiff
John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four
United States Trustee 1835 Assembly St., Ste. 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Linda Barr
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info
Trustee
Janet B. Haigler
Chapter 7 Panel Trustee Post Office Box 505
Chapin, SC 29036
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Strom Thurmond Federal Bldg 1835 Assembly Street Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Thursday, April 13, 2023
15 15 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 04/14 12:19 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/13/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/11 2:01 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/11 1:59 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 22-80044 dd Dismissed Complaint. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (no motion) (order) Tue 04/11 1:57 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceeding. Document Served. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/10 2:42 PM
Proposed Order RE: Adversary case 22-80044 Complaint by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four against Terris Shirelle Riley core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding as Moot Filed by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four Related [+]. (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, January 21, 2023
10 10 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 01/22 12:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 01/21/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, January 19, 2023
9 9 order Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Thu 01/19 2:13 PM
Order: 1) Setting Pretrial Date 2) Fixing Date to File Motions and Discovery 3) Preparation and Filing of Joint Pretrial Order. DATES TO FILE: Motions to Join/Amend: February 20, 2023. Other Motions: April 10, 2023. Discovery: March 20, 2023. Objections: April 24, 2023. Document Served. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Order due by 5/15/2023. (Woods, D)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
8 8 misc Adversary Proceeding Report Tue 01/17 9:09 AM
Adversary Proceeding Report Filed by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four Related [+]. (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, December 29, 2022
7 7 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 12/30 12:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 12/29/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
6 6 order Complete Adversary Proceeding Report (order) Tue 12/27 11:02 AM
Initial Adversary Proceeding Case Management Order. Document Served. Monitor deadline: 1/17/2023 (Woods, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/22 10:28 PM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Servic Related [+] Filed by Terris Shirelle Riley. (Stringer, J.)
Related: [-] []
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
utility Reset Answer Deadline Wed 11/30 9:39 AM
Terris Shirelle Riley Answer Deadline Reset for 12/22/2022. (Woods, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
4 4 misc Certification of Extension Tue 11/29 8:31 AM
Certification of Extension filed by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four as to defendant Terris Shirelle Riley Answer Due Extended To December 22, 2022 Filed by Linda Barr of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four. Related [+]. (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/09 8:43 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Complaint filed by Plaintiff John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four, Summons Issued. Filed by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four Related [+]. (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Wed 11/09 11:14 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 22-80044 dd] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number VOID, amount 350.00. US Trustee is not required to pay the filing fee. (Dillard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 11/08 2:27 PM
Summons Issued on Terris Shirelle Riley Answer Due 12/8/2022 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Woods, D)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/08 1:01 PM
Adversary case 22-80044 Complaint by John P Fitzgerald III, Acting United States Trustee for Region Four against Terris Shirelle Riley core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Barr, Linda)
Related: [-]
utility Add Trustee Tue 11/08 2:21 PM
Janet B. Haigler added to case. (Woods, D)
Related: [-]