Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03044

New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:22-cv-06817
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2022
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:22-cv-04079
Last checked: Sunday May 07, 2023 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Exactech US, Inc.
Represented By
Sheryl A. Bjork
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Sean J. Powell
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Kim M Schmid
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
James S. Bennett
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Susan M. Sharko
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Exactech, Inc.
Represented By
Sheryl A. Bjork
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Sean J. Powell
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Kim M Schmid
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
James S. Bennett
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Susan M. Sharko
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Robertson
Represented By
Joseph S. Piacun
Piacun Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Robertson
Represented By
Joseph S. Piacun
Piacun Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 04 2023
PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/3/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
GPO Jan 11 2023
AMENDED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 01, 2024
order ~Util - Case Stayed Tue 11/05 9:28 AM
Case stayed for Bankruptcy Proceeding. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al.(TLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
37 37 misc Status Report Wed 10/02 9:42 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Phone/Email Tue 01/09 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Sharko, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
35 35 misc Letter Mon 04/10 9:48 PM
Letter re Joint Preservation Protocol by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
34 34 misc Letter Fri 04/07 10:05 PM
Letter re Science Day Order by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
33 33 misc Letter Fri 04/07 9:52 PM
Letter re Second Amended PFS Implementation Order by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Thursday, March 23, 2023
32 32 order Order(Other) Thu 03/23 7:03 PM
AMENDED FACT SHEET IMPLEMENTATION ORDER. The proposed amended fact sheet implementation order at ECF No. 137-1 and its four Exhibits are so ordered as amended. See attached. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 03/23/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (JD) (JD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 (3/23/2023) Exhibit C,
Att: 4 (3/23/2023) Exhibit D
Monday, March 20, 2023
31 31 misc Letter Mon 03/20 10:14 PM
Letter re Science Day by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order re Science Day,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendants' Position re Paragraph 9,
Att: 3 Exhibit TPG's Request for Adjournment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Position re Adjournment and Paragraph 9
Monday, March 13, 2023
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 03/13 11:46 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, March 10, 2023
29 29 misc Letter Fri 03/10 12:38 PM
Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Master Complaint by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/07 4:13 PM
ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 130, 136: The law firm of Bowman and Brooke LLP, counsel for Defendants Exactech, Inc. and Exactech U.S., Inc., shall be terminated from the docket. The proposed order at ECF No. 130-1 is so ordered. See attached. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 03/07/2023. (JD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
27 27 misc Stipulation Mon 03/06 11:20 PM
STIPULATION re Broadspire Documents by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Letter Mon 03/06 11:07 PM
Letter re Fact Sheets by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Fact Sheets,
Att: 2 Plaintiff Fact Sheet,
Att: 3 Plaintiff Supplemental Fact Sheet,
Att: 4 Defendant Fact Sheet,
Att: 5 Defendant Supplemental Fact Sheet
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/01 12:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, February 24, 2023
24 24 misc Letter Fri 02/24 6:57 PM
Letter Regarding Fact Sheets by Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 23, 2023
23 23 misc Letter Thu 02/23 9:41 PM
Letter regarding short form complaint by TPG, Inc., TPG Inc Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Rothman, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
22 22 misc Letter Thu 02/02 4:10 PM
Letter Re: Short Form Complaint by In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
Thursday, January 26, 2023
21 21 misc Letter Thu 01/26 3:31 PM
Letter to Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis, U.S.D.J. and Honorable Marcia Henry, U.S.M.J. re: Update on Plaintiff Website by In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kessler, Rayna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
20 20 notice Notice(Other) Wed 01/11 9:18 PM
NOTICE by Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lia M. Album, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Lawrence Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Patrice Bindel, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Daniel E. Carson, Joseph Centineo, Emanuel Cervelli, Bernadette Chance, Gary J. Cheramie, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Betty Carol Clark, Richard Cozadd, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Robert J. Cullum, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Walton R. Diven, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ivan Hoyos, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Judy Palmer, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Donna M. Reyes, Paul Reyes, Robert Rhodes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Mary Christina Ross, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Edward J. Smith, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, Paul H. Uhle, James Vette, Edward Watson, Monica West, Walter West, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
19 19 notice Notice(Other) Wed 01/11 8:59 PM
NOTICE by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Robert J. Cullum, Lawrence Berger, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Christina Chance, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Ivan Hoyos, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Joseph Centineo, Bernadette Chance, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Betty Carol Clark, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Paul Reyes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark Proposed Practice and Procedure Order #3 (Electronic Service) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
18 18 5 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 01/11 2:42 PM
AMENDED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing) . So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
17 17 5 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 01/04 2:14 PM
PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing) . So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/3/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Fri 12/30 2:01 PM
Letter and Proposed Direct Filing Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Virginia Moraweck, Monica West, Walter West, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Robert J. Cullum, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
15 15 misc Letter Wed 12/21 5:24 PM
Letter To Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis and Honorable Marcia M. Henry by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, December 09, 2022
14 14 misc Letter Fri 12/09 5:53 PM
Letter in response to the Courts December 6, 2022 Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Mary Christina Ross, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Ivan Hoyos, Joseph Centineo, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Paul Reyes, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Ellis Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, James Vette, Edward Watson, George Wilson, Allan Bellone, Kevin McGuire Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
13 13 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 11/29 7:15 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. Related [+]
Related: [-] lkin, Ellen
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CV - Kirk Pope,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - CV - Ellen Relkin,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - CV - Robert E. (Eric) Kennedy,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - CV - Carasusana B. Wall,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - CV - C. Calvin Warriner,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - CV - Rayna E. Kessler,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - CV - Joseph H. Saunders,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - CV - Mark P. Chalos,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - CV - Michael P. Cutler,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - CV - Maria Fleming,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - CV - Arati Furness,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - CV - Jason S. Goldstein,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - CV - David Harman,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - CV - Kristine K. Kraft,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - CV - Hadley E. Lundback,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - CV - Ben C. Martin,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - CV - Daniel A. Nigh,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - CV - Justin Presnal,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - CV - Patrick J. Wigle,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - CV - Cameron J. Falcon,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - CV - Kevin M. Fitzgerald,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - CV - Danielle Gold,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - CV - George E. Mclaughlin,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - CV - Courtney L. Mohammadi,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - CV - Joanna H. Oh,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - CV - Craig M. Silverman,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - CV - Ilana S. Wolk
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
12 12 misc Letter Wed 11/23 2:01 PM
Letter by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/15 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kim M Schmid on behalf of Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc., Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech US, Exactech, U.S., Inc., Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Schmid, Kim)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/14 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl A. Bjork on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
9 9 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 11/08 1:50 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (DEACTIVATED EVENT - DO NOT USE) Tue 11/08 1:49 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-04079. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Staff Notes Tue 11/08 9:38 AM
Order of MDL Transfer to District of Eastern District of New York. MDL case number is 3044. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(my)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Transfer Tue 11/08 1:51 PM
The case of Robertson et al v. Exactech, Inc. , has been transferred from Eastern District of Louisiana. to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 22-cv-6817 . PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Exactech US, Inc. on 11/4/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Piacun, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Exactech, Inc. on 11/4/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Piacun, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
4 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 3044. (my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
3 3 Summons Issued as to Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc..(cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, October 21, 2022
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9618809) filed by Linda Robertson, Bruce Robertson.Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Bruce Robertson(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Linda Robertson(pty:pla).(Piacun, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons