Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:22-cv-01903
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2022
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2022-010554
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 1:41 AM MST
Defendant
Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79
Represented By
Ravi Vasishta Patel
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Georgia A Staton
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
August Jeremy Hoenack
an individual 500 N Estrella Pkwy Ste B2-602
Goodyear, AZ 85338
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Danielle E Clymer
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Defendant
Joanne M Gunning
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Defendant
Jennifer N MacLennan
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Defendant
Kimberly A Moran
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Defendant
Melissa A Zuidema
Terminated: 11/07/2022

GPO Mar 02 2023
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 12). The Court will set a case management conference by separate Order. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/2/2023. (JAMA) Modified on 3/2/2023 to add WO (JAMA).
GPO Oct 01 2024
ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 73.) ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion to Strike as moot. (Doc. 89.) FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in Defendant's favor and close this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/1/24. (EJA)
GPO Nov 20 2024
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. (Doc. 96.) ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order and Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement. (Doc. 97.) FURTHER ORDERED granting in part Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs (Doc. 95) and awarding Defendant $8,000.00 in attorney fees and $1,355.40 in non-taxable costs. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/20/24. (EJA)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, December 23, 2024
115 115 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/23 5:00 PM
NOTICE re: Defendant's Notice of Designation of Transcript on Appeal by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79 .(Ackerman, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript of 4/17/23
Friday, December 20, 2024
114 114 order Judgment Fri 12/20 11:52 AM
JUDGMENT - Defendant Litchfield Elementary School District Number 79 is granted a final judgment against Plaintiff August Jeremy Hoenack as follows: (1) $1,355.40 in non-taxable costs; (2) $8,000.00 in attorney fees. The total amount of the judgment as set forth above is $9,355.40. The foregoing amount of $9,355.40 shall accrue interest from the date of this judgment at the rate provided for under 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/20/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
113 113 appeal Transcript - Appeal Wed 12/18 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings for date of 04/17/2023 before Judge JOHN J. TUCHI re:106 Notice of Appeal - Amended,99 Notice of Appeal. [Court Reporter: Hilda Elizabeth Lopez, RMR, FCRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 1/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2025. (RAP)
Related: [-]