Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Referred: Ca
Case #: 3:22-cv-01782
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2022
Terminated:Apr 14, 2023
Defendant
Craig Lowe
Defendant
Elissa Kumburris
Defendant
John English
Defendant
Jonathan Romance
Defendant
K. Wagenhoffer
Defendant
McNeil
Defendant
Pike County Correctional Facility
Plaintiff
Jameel DeQuan Walston

GPO Apr 14 2023
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Elissa Kumburris, Jonathan Romance, McNeil, John English, K. Wagenhoffer, Craig Lowe. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/14/23. (jam)
GPO Apr 14 2023
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. Any appeal from this Order is DEEMED frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/14/23 (jam)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 14, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/14 3:57 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. Any appeal from this Order is DEEMED frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/14/23 (jam)
Related: [-]
25 25 10 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Fri 04/14 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Elissa Kumburris, Jonathan Romance, McNeil, John English, K. Wagenhoffer, Craig Lowe. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/14/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
24 24 misc Letter Wed 03/15 2:38 PM
Letter from Jameel D. Walston to the COURT re: status of case. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
23 23 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Wed 03/08 2:58 PM
REQUEST for Docket Sheet by Jameel DeQuan Walston. *mailed* (dw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
22 22 misc Document Filed Fri 01/20 11:24 AM
Plaintiffs Amended Brief for Motion to Compel Discovery by Jameel DeQuan Walston.. (dw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
21 21 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Fri 01/06 11:06 AM
REQUEST dtd 1/2/23 for status of case by Jameel DeQuan Walston. (ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
20 20 misc Letter Mon 12/19 11:28 AM
Letter to Court from Jameel D. Walston dated 12/15/22 re: status of motion to appoint counsel and requesting hearing. (dw)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Mon 12/19 11:26 AM
REQUEST for Docket Sheet by Jameel DeQuan Walston. *courtesy copy mailed* (dw)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Request for Production of Documents Mon 12/19 11:24 AM
REQUEST for Production of Documents by Jameel DeQuan Walston.(dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 12/19 11:23 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jameel DeQuan Walston.(dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 12, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Mon 12/12 12:57 PM
Letter from Jameel DeQuan Walston to the Court re: pending motion to appoint counsel. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
15 15 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 12/07 2:14 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John English, Elissa Kumburris, Craig Lowe, McNeil, Jonathan Romance, K. Wagenhoffer.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/07 2:13 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John English, Elissa Kumburris, Craig Lowe, McNeil, Jonathan Romance, K. Wagenhoffer.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/07 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by McNeil, Jonathan Romance, John English, K. Wagenhoffer, Elissa Kumburris, Craig Lowe. McNeil waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Jonathan Romance waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; John English waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; K. Wagenhoffer waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Elissa Kumburris waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023; Craig Lowe waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 12/07 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Geiger on behalf of All Defendants (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
11 11 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 11/30 3:50 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jameel DeQuan Walston.(ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 18, 2022
10 10 3 pgs order Order Directing Clerk's Office to Send Waiver of Service Forms Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/18 9:50 AM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Granting7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Pike County Correctional Facility is DISMISSED. See Order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 11/17/22. (dw) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/18/2022) (dw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
9 9 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Thu 11/17 3:52 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (dw)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 11/17 3:51 PM
CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jameel DeQuan Walston. (dw)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/17 3:48 PM
UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jameel DeQuan Walston.(dw)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Thu 11/17 3:47 PM
Letter from Jameel DeQuan Walston re: cases filed. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order - 30 Day Administrative Order Wed 11/09 9:54 AM
THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by lp on 11/09/2022.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (civil rights)
4 4 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Wed 11/09 9:52 AM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Instruction Sheet,
Att: 3 Fed and Local Rules,
Att: 4 398 Forms,
Att: 5 399 Form
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 11/09 9:41 AM
CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jameel DeQuan Walston. (lp) Modified on 11/9/2022 (lp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Filed Wed 11/09 9:40 AM
Application to proceed in forma pauperis (not on this District's form) by Jameel DeQuan Walston..(lp) Modified on 11/9/2022 (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent for Funds
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/09 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jameel DeQuan Walston.(lp) Modified on 11/9/2022 (lp)
Related: [-]