Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11824

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:22-ap-01152
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2022
Terminated:Mar 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Meacher
1450 N. Tuweap Drive
Ivins, UT 84738
Represented By
Michael Meacher
contact info
Defendant
Dianne Meacher
1450 N. Tuweap Drive
Ivins, UT 84738
Represented By
Dianne Meacher
contact info
Plaintiff
Front Sight Management LLC
1 Front Sight Rd.
Pahrump, NV 89061
Represented By
SUSAN K. SEFLIN
Bg Law LLP
contact info
Susan K. Seflin
Bg Law LLP
contact info
Jessica S. Wellington
Bg Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/17 9:17 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
11 11 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Tue 02/28 8:30 AM
Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Front Sight Management LLC.
Monday, February 27, 2023
10 10 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Mon 02/27 9:20 AM
Joint Stipulation By Front Sight Management LLC and Between Michael Meacher dba Bankgroup Financial Services and Dianne Meacher Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Complaint Filed by TERESA M. PILATOWICZ on behalf of Front Sight Management LLC Related [+] (PILATOWICZ, TERESA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Front Sight Management LLC.
Friday, January 06, 2023
9 9 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Fri 01/06 4:13 PM
Notice of Appearance as Special Counsel [corrected] Filed by TERESA M. PILATOWICZ on behalf of Front Sight Management LLC (PILATOWICZ, TERESA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
8 8 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 12/14 9:40 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Plaintiff Front Sight Management LLC.
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
7 7 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Tue 12/13 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance as Special Counsel Filed by TERESA M. PILATOWICZ on behalf of Front Sight Management LLC (PILATOWICZ, TERESA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/12 2:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for: (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (4) Avoidance and Recovery of Constructively Fraudulent Transfers; (5) Preservation of Lien; (6) Objection to Claim; (7) Claim Disallowance; and (8) Equitable Subordination of Claim Related [+] Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of Dianne Meacher (FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/12 2:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for: (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (4) Avoidance and Recovery of Constructively Fraudulent Transfers; (5) Preservation of Lien; (6) Objection to Claim; (7) Claim Disallowance; and (8) Equitable Subordination of Claim Related [+] Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of Michael Meacher (FELL, THOMAS)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/16 10:09 AM
Summons Service Executed on Dianne Meacher 11/16/2022; Michael Meacher 11/16/2022 Filed by JESSICA S. WELLINGTON on behalf of Front Sight Management LLC (WELLINGTON, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 11/10 2:49 PM
Summons Issued on Dianne Meacher , Michael Meacher (cly)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Thu 11/10 12:10 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/14/2023 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Front Sight Management LLC.
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/09 12:34 PM
Adversary case 22-01152 Complaint for: (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (4) Avoidance and Recovery of Constructively Fraudulent Transfers; (5) Preservation of Lien; (6) Objection to Claim; (7) Claim Disallowance; and (8) Equitable Subordination of Claim Filed by Front Sight Management LLC vs. Michael Meacher, Dianne Meacher Fee Amount $350. (91 (Declaratory judgment)(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)(SEFLIN, SUSAN)
Related: [-]