Blanton v. Young
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis T Babcock |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-02930 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Case in other court: | USDC for the District of New Mexico, 1:22-cv-00841 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2023 2:58 AM MDT |
Defendant
Jason Young
|
|
Plaintiff
Gina Blanton
1210 Las Rosas Drive
Los Lunas, NM 87031 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 05/26 11:29 AM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal. We dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (USCA Case No. 23-1168 . (jtorr, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 05/19 3:34 PM
USCA Case Number 23-1168 for17 Notice of Appeal filed by Gina Blanton. (sphil, ) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal
Fri 05/19 9:56 AM
LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the17 Notice of Appeal filed by Gina Blanton to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,)(sphil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Preliminary Record, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal - 10th Circuit
Fri 05/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Order Reassigning Case,, Order Dismissing Case,16 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (sphil, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 12/28 4:26 PM
JUDGMENT by Clerk re:15 Order on 12/28/2022. (sdunb, ) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/28 4:23 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and failure to prosecute. It is FURTHER ORDERED that IFP on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/28/2022. (sdunb, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Recusal
Wed 12/14 10:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER Denying12 Emergency Motion to disqualify Judge Babcock from all suits, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/14/2022.(sphil, ) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Disqualify
Fri 12/09 11:00 AM
Letter re: an Emergency MOTION to Disqualify by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (sphil, ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Recusal
Fri 12/09 10:59 AM
Letter re: MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (sphil, ) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/08 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Inform the court re: recusal of judge by Plaintiff Gina Blanton (sphil, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Recusal
Wed 12/07 8:47 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/6/2022, re:7 Plaintiff's letter/motion for recusal is DENIED.(sphil, ) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 12/05 2:58 PM
MOTION to Enjoin in Injunctive Relief Permanent Injunction D442021CR403 by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (agarc, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 12/05 2:56 PM
Emergency MOTION Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (agarc, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 12/05 8:17 AM
LETTER re: judges presiding over this case by Plaintiff Gina Blanton. (sphil, ) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/17 1:55 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order , the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/17/2022. (sphil, ) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) | |
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 11/10 8:29 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:22-cv-00841. File, transfer order and docket sheet received |
|
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 11/10 8:48 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT OF COLORADO by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm) [Transferred from New Mexico on 11/10/2022.] | |
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 11/10/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Young, filed by Gina Blanton. (jg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 11/10/2022.] | |
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 11/10/2022.] |