New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:22-cv-09627
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2023 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Montefiore Medical Center, Corp.
Represented By
Jean L. Schmidt
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Emma Jane Diamond
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrell Williams
377 West Pleasant Ave Apt. 301
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
Jerome Noll
Marzec Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Darius Adam Marzec
Marzec Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
41 41 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 07/11 1:49 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against the defendant(s) Montefiore Medical Center, Corp., without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Montefiore Medical Center, Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/11/2024) (vfr) Modified on 7/11/2024 (vfr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Thu 07/11 3:03 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
40 40 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 07/03 9:54 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
39 39 misc Status Report Mon 05/06 5:15 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 03/07 3:21 PM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion to Compel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will construe plaintiff's silence as a decision to "withdraw or formally abandon all claims for emotional distress," except for garden-variety emotional distress, "in order to avoid forfeiting his psychotherapist-patient privilege." In re Sims, 534 F.3d 117, 134 (2d Cir. 2008); it is further ORDERED that the parties continue with discovery, as limited as it may now be, and provide the Court with a status update within sixty (60) days from the issuance of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 24. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/7/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
37 37 order Endorsed Letter Tue 02/27 4:52 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. Williams and Counsel from Naomi Reice Buchwald United States District Judge dated February 27, 2024 re: Darrell Williams v. Montefiore Medical Center, Corp., 22-cv-9627 (NRB). ENDORSEMENT: Dear Mr. Williams and Counsel: In this action, plaintiff claims that Montefiore Medical Center (defendant) discriminated against him based on his disability and religion when it terminated his employment because he refused to take the COVID-19 vaccine. ECF No. 4 (Am. Compl.) 2. Plaintiff alleges that as a result of his termination, he was left with no insurance and was not able to continue his therapy to treat his anxiety, ADHD, and depression, which, in turn, left him in a mental and emotional turmoil. Id. 30-31. For this alleged harm, plaintiff seeks, among other things, compensatory and punitive damages. In his response to defendants interrogatories, plaintiff identified licensed social worker Mr. Mark T. Insetta (Mr. Insetta) as someone from whom he had received treatment during the relevant time period. ECF No. 24-1 17. Consequently, defendant repeatedly requested that Mr. Insetta produce plaintiffs medical records. ECF No. 24 at 2. However, Mr. Insetta has refused to produce those records because, according to a letter he wrote to the Court, producing them would be a violation of client confidentiality. ECF No. 26, Ex. A. It is well established that when a plaintiff directly put[s] [his] mental and emotional state at issue, he waive[s] any psychotherapist-patient privilege. Cuoco v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons, 98 Civ. 9009 (WHP), 2003 WL 1618530, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 27, 2003) (citing cases). Here, there is no question that plaintiff put his mental and emotional state at issue. Indeed, apart from the termination itself, plaintiffs primary claim for damages is that his psychological condition deteriorated once he could not continue therapy. Am. Compl. paragraph 31. Thus, plaintiff is left with the following choice. On the one hand, if plaintiff wishes to continue pursuing this case, he must consent to Mr. Insettas producing plaintiffs medical records. On the other hand, if plaintiff refuses to provide such consent, which is entirely within his right, he will be unable to seek damages for any emotional distress and will be limited to a claim (if proven) for lost wages. Plaintiff has seven (7) days from the filing of this order to advise the Court as to his decision. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/27/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Mon 02/05 2:14 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/5/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
35 35 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 12/08 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/14/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Transcript Fri 12/08 1:12 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/14/2023 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/29/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2024..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
33 33 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Wed 11/15 7:50 AM
MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, Re: for Permission for Darrell Williams to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Darrell Williams.(sc)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 7:47 AM
NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Darrell Williams. (sc)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 11/15 7:45 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Darrell Williams consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Darrell Williams.(sc)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/28 7:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Conference held on 11/14/2023. (ade)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 10/25 9:35 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 30. Mailed to: Darrell Williams 377 West Pleasantview Avenue Apt. 301 Hackensack, NJ 07601. ; and a Consent to Electronic Service form (sha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/24 5:08 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDERED that the Firm's motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff is granted; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court flag this as a pro se case pursuant to plaintiff's representation that he intends to represent himself pro se. ECF No. 25; it is further ORDERED that the Court will hold a conference in this case at 12:30 P.M. on November 14, 2023. The conference will take place in Courtroom 21A at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Attendance is required and failure to attend without a bona fide justification will be considered as an indication that plaintiff does not intend to pursue this action; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send this order to plaintiff via U. S. mail at 377 West Pleasantview Avenue, Apt. 301, Hackensack, New Jersey 07601, which is the address he provided in his pro se notice of appearance, ECF No. 25; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send plaintiff via U. S. mail instructions to consent to electronic service and a consent to electronic service form. Attorney Darius Adam Marzec and Jerome Noll terminated. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/24/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 10/24 5:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
29 29 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 10/23 1:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 MOTION for Marzec Law Firm, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney for Darrell Williams . . Document filed by Darrell Williams, Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/23 1:32 PM
MOTION for Marzec Law Firm, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney for Darrell Williams . Document filed by Darrell Williams, Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Darius A. Marzec, Esq.,
Att: 2 Affidavit Certification of Service
Monday, October 16, 2023
27 27 misc Letter Mon 10/16 11:32 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Johane Severin dated October 16, 2023 re: Defendant's Response to Issues Raised in Letter from Mark Insetta. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email from Mark Insetta, dated September 18, 2023
Thursday, October 12, 2023
26 26 order Endorsed Letter Thu 10/12 5:34 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Jerome Noll, Darius Adam Marzec, Jean L. Schmidt, Emma Jane Diamond, Johane Severin from Naomi Reice Buchwald, United States District Judge dated 10/12/2023 re: The Court has received the letter from Mark Insetta attached as Exhibit A. We request that the parties respond to the issue he raises. Very truly yours. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/12/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darius Adam Marzec on behalf of Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 28, 2023
24 24 motion Compel Thu 09/28 12:27 PM
LETTER MOTION to Compel Darrel Williams and Mark Insetta to Appear for a deposition and produce Plaintiff's medical records, respectively addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Johane Severin dated September 28, 2023. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Interrogatory Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Signed HIPAA Release Forms,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email from Mark Insetta
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 08/02 4:36 PM
ORDER granting22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/2/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/02 4:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Fact Discovery due by 10/23/2023. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/27 3:39 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jerome Noll, Esq. dated 07/27/2023. Document filed by Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/27 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johane Severin on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Severin, Johane)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Sun 06/11 10:44 AM
ORDER: granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application Granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/09/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 06/11 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2023. Fact Discovery due by 8/22/2023. Motions due by 9/5/2023. (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 06/08 3:49 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Emma J. Diamond dated June 8, 2023. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Diamond, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 05/16 9:29 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Diamond, Emma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
17 17 order Case Management Plan Thu 03/02 4:19 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have confe1Ted and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: Four (4) to five (5) days. The parties shall furnish the Court with a status report every sixty (60) days. The next Case Management Conference is TBA. Deposition due by 6/23/2023. Fact Discovery due by 7/7/2023. Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2023. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/2/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Wed 03/01 6:35 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Wed 03/01 6:34 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Darius A. Marzec, Esq. and Jean Schmidt, Esq. dated March 1, 2023 re: Status Report re: Settlement. Document filed by Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/08 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Noll on behalf of Darrell Williams..(Noll, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
order Order Wed 02/08 10:24 AM
The dial-in for today's conference at 1:30PM is (888) 363-4749 and the access code is 2712517. Related [+]
Related: [-] isig, Lauren
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 02/09 8:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/8/2023. (ade)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 01/13 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL TELECONFERENCE: This action has been assigned to me for all purposes. Counsel are directed to appear telephonically for an initial teleconference with the Court, on the date and time listed below. The dial-in and passcode information will be posted to ECF on the date of the teleconference, as further set forth. Date and time of teleconference: Wednesday, February 8 at 1:30 p.m. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/12/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/11 4:07 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/11 4:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Montefiore Health System, Inc. for Montefiore Medical Center, Corp.. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
10 10 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 12/23 1:19 PM
STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties, that Defendant Montefiore Medical Center's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended up to and including Wednesday, January 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Montefiore Medical Center, Corp. answer due 1/11/2023. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/23/2022) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
9 9 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 12/21 11:31 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/21 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean L. Schmidt on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/21 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emma Jane Diamond on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(Diamond, Emma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 11/17 2:21 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montefiore Medical Center, Corp...(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/17 11:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Montefiore Medical Center, Corp. D/B/A Montefiore Medical Center, re:4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/16 12:14 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending3 Amended Complaint, against Montefiore Medical Center Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darrell Williams. Related document:3 Amended Complaint,..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 11/16 11:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Darius Adam Marzec to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 11/16 2:32 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Darius Adam Marzec. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Montefiore Medical Center. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/15 7:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Darrell Williams with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darrell Williams. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 11/15 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge P. Kevin Castel is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/14 1:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/14 12:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Darius Adam Marzec. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 11/14 12:32 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Darius Adam Marzec. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 11/14 12:34 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 11/14 12:34 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 11/14 12:34 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/10 6:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Montefiore Medical Center. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26947917)Document filed by Darrell Williams..(Marzec, Darius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet SDNY Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Summons