Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:22-cv-00437
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2022
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 10, 2023 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
KLX Energy Services,LLC
Represented By
Michael E Jones
Potter Minton
contact info
Zachary A P Oubre
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Shaun William Hassett
Potter Minton
contact info
Plaintiff
Safoco, Inc.
Represented By
David Kent Anderson
Anderson & Cunningham PC
contact info

GPO Jun 10 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Texas filed by KLX Energy Services,LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/10/2023. (ch, )
GPO Jun 29 2023
6/29/2023. (ch, )ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 29 Report and Recommendations Court OVERRULES KLXs Objections and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation and orders that the Motion (Dkt. No. 8) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
63 63 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 05/15 4:46 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (CH)
Related: [-]
62 62 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/15 4:45 PM
ORDER granting61 Stipulation of Dismissal. Accordingly, all claims and causes of action asserted between Plaintiffand Defendant in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]