Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:22-cv-02890
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2022
Terminated:Jun 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 13, 2023 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Nancy Howard
Defendant
Synergy Youth, LLC
Plaintiff
Huntington National Bank
Represented By
Mark G Schroeder
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Daniel N Moak
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 12, 2023
28 28 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 06/12 1:15 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Nancy Howard against Synergy Youth, LLC, Nancy Howard(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Friday, June 09, 2023
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 06/09 10:32 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/9/2023. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
25 25 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/05 3:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Huntington National Bank re24 Proposed Order to Judge,23 Declaration (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Mon 06/05 3:34 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Declaration Mon 06/05 3:33 PM
DECLARATION of Mark G. Schroeder re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Huntington National Bank . (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 06/09 10:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2023 re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank. Motion granted. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
22 22 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 04/04 10:04 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER: Due to the pending Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No.15 ), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 4/4/2023.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/30 2:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Huntington National Bank re20 Proposed Order to Judge,15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ,19 Declaration in Support,17 Memorandum in Support of Motion,18 Declaration in Support,16 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Thu 03/30 2:28 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 03/30 2:27 PM
Declaration of Daniel N. Moak in Support of15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 03/30 2:26 PM
Declaration of Jordan Shamblott in Support of15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-2
17 17 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 03/30 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank.(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 03/30 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to : Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge John R. Tunheim. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/30 2:19 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Huntington National Bank. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 01/11 4:21 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nancy Howard, Synergy Youth, LLC. (MMP)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/11 3:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Huntington National Bank re11 Application for Entry of Default,12 Declaration (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Declaration Wed 01/11 3:15 PM
DECLARATION of Mark G. Schroeder re11 Application for Entry of Default by Huntington National Bank . (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Entry of Default Wed 01/11 3:14 PM
APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/22 12:34 PM
NOTICE by Huntington National Bank Notice Letter(Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Notice Letter
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
9 9 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 12/21 2:40 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Action required. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/21/2022. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/12 8:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Synergy Youth, LLC served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/09 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Huntington National Bank Notice Letter (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Thu 12/08 10:59 AM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 12/8/2022.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/15 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Nancy Howard served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/14 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Howard, Synergy Youth, LLC. (MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 22-cv-2890 (JRT/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 11/14 11:00 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Huntington National Bank. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/14 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy Howard, Synergy Youth, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9887232) filed by Huntington National Bank. Filer requests summons issued. (Schroeder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-J,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 11/14 11:10 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 22-cv-2890 (JRT/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]