Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:22-cv-04559
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
CHUBB & SONS, INC.
100 William Street
New York, NY 10038
Defendant
FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
55 Water Street
New York, NY 10041
Defendant
HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY
One Hartford Plaza
Hartford, CT 06115
Plaintiff
GARFIELD REFINING LLC.
810 East Cayuga Street
Philadelphia, PA 19125
Represented By
MICHAEL CONLEY
Offit Kurman PA
contact info
Unrepresented Party
CHUBB & SONS, INC.
100 William Street
New York, NY 10038
Unrepresented Party
FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
55 WATER STREET
NEW YORK, NY 10041
Unrepresented Party
HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY
ONE HARTFORD PLAZA
HARTFORD, CT 06115


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/17 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GARFIELD REFINING LLC. As To All Defendants - Hartford Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company and Chubb & Sons, Inc.(CONLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
misc Remark Tue 05/09 8:43 AM
DOC. NOS.8 AND9 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 5/9/23. (amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/08 11:58 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 55 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/8/23. 5/8/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/08 11:56 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MUST MAKE PROPER SERVICE ON THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANTS WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF PROPER SERVICE BY MAY 18, 2023 WILL RESULT IN THIS CASE BEING DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANTS HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY AND FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/8/23. 5/8/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/20 4:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Silberman re: served Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Summons in a Civil Action, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons and a Waiver of the Service of Summons upon Legal Department - Defendant Chubb & Sons, Inc. by Requesting a Waiver on March 13, 2023(CONLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter to Legal Department Containing Service Package to Defendant Chubb & Sons, Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery Regarding Letter to Legal Department Containing Service Package to Defendant Chubb & Sons, Inc.
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/20 4:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Conley re: served Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Summons in a Civil Action, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons and a Waiver of the Service of Summons regarding Defendant Hartford Insurance Company and Defendant Federal Insurance Company upon Scott Osmus - Defendant Hartford Insurance Company; Celeste Pisano - Defendant Federal Insurance Company by Requesting a Waiver on November 16, 2022(CONLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email of Service Package to Defendant Hartford Insurance Company,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email of Service Package to Defendant Federal Insurance Company
Thursday, March 09, 2023
misc Remark Thu 03/09 8:47 AM
DOC. 5 MAILED TO UNREPS. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/07 12:29 PM
ORDER THAT upon consideration of plaintiffs letter request, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for plaintiff to make service is extended to March 15, 2023.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/7/2023. 3/7/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/23 8:29 AM
ORDERED that the plaintiff must make service by March 8, 2023.This Order also serves as notice to the plaintiff, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), that if the plaintiff fails to file proof of service by March 13, 2023, without showing good cause for such failure, the court must dismiss without prejudice the case against any unserved defendants. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/22/2023. 2/23/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/16 3:29 PM
12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/15 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to CHUBB & SONS, INC., FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: Michael Conley on 11/15/22 (fdc)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 11/15 9:40 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16312125.), filed by GARFIELD REFINING LLC..(CONLEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form