New Mexico District Court
Judge:Steven C Yarbrough
Referred: John F Robbenhaar
Case #: 1:22-cv-00865
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2022
Terminated:Feb 15, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 3:10 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Circled Wagons Management, LLC
Represented By
Esther C. Jamison
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Paul J. Kennedy
Kennedy Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Jessica M Hernandez
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Dale Hiller
Represented By
Gina Tassotti Constant
Constant Law, LLC
contact info
John H Bryan
John H. Bryan
contact info
Defendant
Circled Wagons Management, LLC
Represented By
Esther C. Jamison
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Paul J. Kennedy
Kennedy Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Jessica M Hernandez
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Nicholas Layman
Plaintiff
Dale Hiller
Represented By
Gina Tassotti Constant
Constant Law, LLC
contact info
John H Bryan
John H. Bryan
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Lackluster Media, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Circled Wagons Management, LLC
Represented By
Esther C. Jamison
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Paul J. Kennedy
Kennedy Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Jessica M Hernandez
Kennedy, Hernandez & Harrison, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
19 19 Report re: copyright (dr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
18 18 3 pgs ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
17 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Dale Hiller. (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
16 16 3 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2023. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/22/2023. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
15 15 NOTICE by Nicholas Layman of Agreed Extension for Answer to Complaint (Jamison, Esther)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
14 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Nicholas Layman served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
13 13 35 pgs ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Lackluster Media, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Dale Hiller by Circled Wagons Management, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Dale Hiller.(Hernandez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
12 12 NOTICE by Dale Hiller re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Dale Hiller by Gina Tassotti Constant on behalf of: John H. Bryan JohnBryanLaw 411 Main Street Union, WV 24983 304-772-4999 Fax 304-772-4998 jhb@johnbryanlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Association Dues received online: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-8595027 re: 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Dale Hiller (bap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Circled Wagons Management, LLC served on 11/30/2022, answer due 12/21/2022. (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hiller. Nicholas Layman served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Hiller re Summons Issued Nicholas Layman (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Hiller re Summons Issued Circled Wagons Management LLC (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
5 5 NOTICE by Dale Hiller Certificate of Good Standing (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Dale Hiller by John H Bryan (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bryan, John)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
3 3 Report re:copyright (dr)
Related: [-]
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dale Hiller. (Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
Related: [-]
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8558064 re1 Complaint filed by Dale Hiller (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Constant, Gina)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]