Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:22-cv-04527
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Case in other court:Civil District Court Orleans Parish, 22-09102
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
John Michael Zazulak
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand, Brackett, LLC
contact info
Mark Emerson Hanna
Mouledoux Bland Legrand & Brackett LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Camille Zander
Represented By
Tyler J. Rench
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Covert J. Geary
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Zander
Represented By
Tyler J. Rench
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Covert J. Geary
Jones Walker (new Orleans)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 21 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 9:28 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 02/14 11:02 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant, Scottsdale Insurance Company, are dismissed, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/14/2023. (pp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Mon 02/13 1:42 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Scott Zander and Camille Zander and by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 23, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 12/23 12:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022.(lag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12/20/22 Order,
Att: 2 Case List
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 11/23 12:25 PM
Notice of Compliance Response to Court's 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive by Scottsdale Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal,,. (Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 11/23 12:21 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 11/22 1:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
5 5 order Text Order Thu 11/17 1:02 PM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 11/17 11:41 AM
Filing fee received from Mark Emerson Hanna: $ 402.00, Receipt No. ALAEDC-9658301 (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/16 3:43 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (cs)
Related: [-]
3 3 27 pgs order Order Wed 11/16 3:39 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 11/15 4:59 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (mb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/15 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2022-9102 (Fee previously paid) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice,
Att: 6 Verification,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet