Oregon District Court
Judge:Youlee Yim You
Case #: 3:22-cv-01790
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 14, 2023 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Nike Inc.
Represented By
Christine Sargent
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Katherine Tank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
John A. Berg
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Holly M. Robbins
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Doug Kerkering
Represented By
Emerson L. Lenon
Thenell Law Group, LLC
contact info
Chelsea P. Pyasetskyy
Thenell Law Group
contact info
Kirsten L. Curtis
Thenell Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Scott J. Street
Jw Howard/attorneys
contact info
Plaintiff
Wanda Rozwadowska
Represented By
Emerson L. Lenon
Thenell Law Group, LLC
contact info
Chelsea P. Pyasetskyy
Thenell Law Group
contact info
Kirsten L. Curtis
Thenell Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Scott J. Street
Jw Howard/attorneys
contact info
Plaintiff
Hannah Thibodo
Represented By
Emerson L. Lenon
Thenell Law Group, LLC
contact info
Chelsea P. Pyasetskyy
Thenell Law Group
contact info
Kirsten L. Curtis
Thenell Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Scott J. Street
Jw Howard/attorneys
contact info

GPO May 30 2023
h a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement. Signed on 5/30/2023 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)Findings & Recommendations: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 18) should be granted in that plaintiffs Kerkering and Thibodo's First Claim for Relief, based on the theory that defendant regarded them as disabled because of their vaccination status, should be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim. However, Thibodo should be allowed to amend the complaint to allege that she informed her supervisor that her disability prevented her from being vaccinated and that she requested an accommodation to the vaccine mandate, which was denied. The motion to dismiss should be denied as to the Second and Third Claims alleged by plaintiff Rozwadowska. These Findings and Recommendations will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due Tuesday, June 13, 2023. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served wit
GPO Jul 31 2023
ORDER - The Court ADOPTS Judge You's Findings and Recommendation. ECF 28. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. ECF 18. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs' first claim for relief, allowing only Plaintiff Thibodo leave to amend. Plaintiff Thibodo may file an amended complaint within two weeks from the entry of this Order to cure deficiencies in Thibodo's allegations in the first claim. The Court denies Defendant's motion with respect to Plaintiffs' second and third claims for relief. Signed on 7/31/2023 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
68 68 motion Consolidate Fri 05/09 9:54 AM
Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Street, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dec. of Scott J. Street ISO Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
67 67 minute Settlement Conference Wed 05/07 9:33 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on May 6, 2025. The case did not settle. The continued settlement conference set for May 7, 2025, is canceled. Scott J. Street present as counsel for plaintiffs. Claire Welch, Holly M. Robbins and in-house counsel John McIlwee present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
Related: [-]