New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:22-cv-09712
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 13, 2023 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Bridget Barbera
Defendant
Susan E. Ebersole
Defendant
Lehman College
Defendant
City University of New York
Plaintiff
Priya Harriram
2870 Grand Concourse Apt. #3
Bronx, NY 10458


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 02/06 12:14 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 138. Mailed to: Priya Harriram 2870 Grand Concourse Apt. #3 Bronx, NY 10458. (ne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
138 138 8 pgs order Order Wed 02/05 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel and pro se Plaintiff must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jeannette-vargas, including the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Pro Se Cases, a copy of which is attached. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Nothing herein shall affect the scope of the existing reference to the Magistrate Judge. Any conference or oral argument before or directed by the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 2/5/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]